This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:22:54 (UTC).

CHITO v. NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 CHITO filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maureen P. Kelly and David S. Cercone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01482

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

Presiding Judge

David S. Cercone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIMOTHY R. CHITO

Defendant

NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clayton S. Morrow

Attorney at Morrow & Artim, PC

304 Ross Street, 7Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Katherine L. Pomerleau

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott

600 Grant Street, Usx Tower 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Notice of Mediation by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. Mediation Date 2/14/19, 10 AM (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Patricia Dodge is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be concluded by 02/14/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/14/18. (eca) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#11

(#11) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosures required by Rule 26(a) due by 1/15/2019; Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2019; Discovery due by 4/1/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/29/2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/14/18. (eca) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties shall confer no later than 11/30/18 to arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). A Rule 26(f) Report and either the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process or the Expedited Docket Stipulation due on or before 12/07/18. The Initial Case Management Conference is scheduled for 12/14/18 at 9:00 a.m. in the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/20/18. (eca) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (sdp) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR-18-3720 with jury demand Copies attached: complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4923254), filed by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice of Mediation by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. Mediation Date 2/14/19, 10 AM (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Patricia Dodge is appointed as mediator. Mediation to be concluded by 02/14/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/14/18. (eca) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosures required by Rule 26(a) due by 1/15/2019; Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2019; Discovery due by 4/1/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/29/2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 12/14/18. (eca) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/14/2018. (Court Reporter: None) (eca) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION selecting ADR process by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Judge David S. Cercone presiding and Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly referred. (nll) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer presiding in case. (nll) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by TIMOTHY R. CHITO. (Morrow, Clayton) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The parties shall confer no later than 11/30/18 to arrange for the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). A Rule 26(f) Report and either the Stipulation Selecting ADR Process or the Expedited Docket Stipulation due on or before 12/07/18. The Initial Case Management Conference is scheduled for 12/14/18 at 9:00 a.m. in the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/20/18. (eca) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Pomerleau, Katherine) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#3) ORDER OF COURT. Since this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file no later than 11/28/18, a form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge. The applicable form is available on the Court's website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a Magistrate Judge, Magistrate Judge Kelly will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/07/18. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • SCHEDULING ORDER. Defendant shall Answer or otherwise plead no later than 11/21/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/07/18. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's only notice on the matter. (eca) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (sdp) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number AR-18-3720 with jury demand Copies attached: complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4923254), filed by NATIONAL ENTERPRISE SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.