This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:24 (UTC).

Ching Chin Chen v. Santa Monica College District

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Ching Chin Chen filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Santa Monica College District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and S. James Otero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07403

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

S. James Otero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ching Chin Chen

Arcadia, CA 91007

Defendant

Santa Monica College District

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby GRANTED. (ch) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Ching Chin Chen. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

CV-71

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Santa Monica College District.Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Ching Chin Chen. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Ching Chin Chen. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby GRANTED. (ch) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Ching Chin Chen. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Ching Chin Chen. (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Santa Monica College District.Case assigned to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Ching Chin Chen. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less