This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:42:13 (UTC).

Chiarella v. State of Rhode Island

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Chiarella filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against State of Rhode Island. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00547

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Joseph Chiarella

Providence, RI 02805

Respondent

State of Rhode Island

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Aaron L. Weisman

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

150 South Main Street, 274-4400, Fax: 222-2995

Providence, RI 02903

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Chiarella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

1 #1

Exhibits

#5

(#5) CORRECTED JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's Writ of Habeas Corpus - So ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/3/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/17/2018) (Urizandi, Nisshy). Modified on 10/17/2018 (Urizandi, Nisshy). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Joseph Chiarella. Responses due by 10/16/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

1 #2

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Chiarella. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER dismissing #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/3/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CORRECTED JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's Writ of Habeas Corpus - So ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/3/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/17/2018) (Urizandi, Nisshy). Modified on 10/17/2018 (Urizandi, Nisshy). (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion to Compel - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/3/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER dismissing #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/3/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Joseph Chiarella. Responses due by 10/16/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Chiarella. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Chiarella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Joseph Chiarella. Responses due by 10/16/2018. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Chiarella. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Joseph Chiarella. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.