This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2019 at 07:20:58 (UTC).

Cherry et al v. Atrium Medical Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/12/2018 Cherry filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Atrium Medical Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Landya B. McCafferty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01044

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Landya B. McCafferty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Russell Cherry

Alexis Cherry

RaShonda Cherry

Brittany Cherry

Defendants

Atrium Medical Corporation

Getinge AB

Maquet Cardiovascular US Sales, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

D. Michael Noonan

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon PA

140 Washington St, Po Box 977

Dover, NH 03821-0977

Defendant Attorneys

Pierre A. Chabot

Attorney at Wadleigh Starr & Peters PLLC

95 Market St

Manchester, NH 03101

Enjolique D. Aytch

Attorney at Akerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Hugh J. Turner, Jr.

Attorney at Akerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Blvd, Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

3 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

3 #1

Exhibit Subpoena

3 #1061

(#3) NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Orent, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

#4

(#2) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to the Deadline to File a Reply in Support of Getinge ABs Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Getinge AB. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1731986 filed by Russell Cherry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noonan, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2018: #2 CORRECTED Short form complaint) (tb). (Entered: 11/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Subpoena by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Orent, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to the Deadline to File a Reply in Support of Getinge ABs Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Getinge AB. 1:16-md-02753-LM et al.(Aytch, Enjolique) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • MDL 2753: Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 18-cv-1044-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0102-1731986 filed by Russell Cherry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noonan, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2018: #2 CORRECTED Short form complaint) (tb). (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.