This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2019 at 07:33:13 (UTC).

Cheney v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Cheney filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01148

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Cheney

Berlin, NH 03570

Defendants

NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner

Paula Mattis

Raj Pande

Bernadette Campbell

Kathy Belisle

FNU Anzel

Jose Aviles

MHM Solutions, Inc.

Centurion of New Hampshire, LLC.

Keith Batchelder

Edward Dransite

Not Classified By Court

NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)

NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only)

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal/ Voluntary Non-Suit by Michael Cheney. Terminated Party Keith Batchelder, Kathy Belisle, Bernadette Campbell, Centurion of New Hampshire, LLC., Edward Dransite, MHM Solutions, Inc., Paula Mattis, NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only), NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only), NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Raj Pande, FNU Anzel (First Name Unknown) and Jose Aviles. (Case Closed) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Mail Returned - Rejected NCF - Mail Room - Refused by I/M 2 times sent to Michael Cheney re Summonses.(jb) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Mail Returned - Rejected NCF - Mail Room - Refused by I/M 3 times re #2 Filing Fee Omitted Notice, Notice - ECF, #1 Complaint, Case Assigned sent to Michael Cheney.(jb) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution, and Prisoner Consent Form.Compliance Deadline set for 2/12/2019.(ej) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Cover Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against FNU Anzel, Jose Aviles, Keith Batchelder, Kathy Belisle, Bernadette Campbell, Centurion of New Hampshire, LLC., Edward Dransite, MHM Solutions, Inc., Paula Mattis, NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Raj Pande with Jury Demand filed by Michael Cheney. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(ej) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER re #5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal/Voluntary Non-Suit and Request to Transfer Filing Fee Back to Case # 18-cv-817-JL. Text of Order: Michael Cheney asks the court to reapply his one-sixth portion of the $400 filing fee originally paid jointly by the plaintiffs in Case No. 18-cv-817-JL back to that case, as Cheney has taken a voluntary non-suit in his severed case, Case No. 18-cv-1148-JL. Cheney's motion is granted to the extent that the clerk's office is directed to update the court's records to show Cheneys portion of the filing fee ($66.67) is credited back to Case No. 18-cv-817-JL. This Order shall be filed in that case and in Case No. 18-cv-1148-JL, as Cheney's motion was docketed in both cases (Doc. No. 16 in Case No. 18-cv-817-JL; Doc. No. 5 in Case No. 18-cv-1148-JL). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jb) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal/ Voluntary Non-Suit by Michael Cheney. Terminated Party Keith Batchelder, Kathy Belisle, Bernadette Campbell, Centurion of New Hampshire, LLC., Edward Dransite, MHM Solutions, Inc., Paula Mattis, NH Attorney General - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only), NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - Civil (Court Use Only), NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Raj Pande, FNU Anzel (First Name Unknown) and Jose Aviles. (Case Closed) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Mail Returned - Rejected NCF - Mail Room - Refused by I/M 2 times sent to Michael Cheney re Summonses.(jb) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Mail Returned - Rejected NCF - Mail Room - Refused by I/M 3 times re #2 Filing Fee Omitted Notice, Notice - ECF, #1 Complaint, Case Assigned sent to Michael Cheney.(jb) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs,Certificate of Custodial Institution, and Prisoner Consent Form.Compliance Deadline set for 2/12/2019.(ej) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-1148-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FNU Anzel, Jose Aviles, Keith Batchelder, Kathy Belisle, Bernadette Campbell, Centurion of New Hampshire, LLC., Edward Dransite, MHM Solutions, Inc., Paula Mattis, NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Raj Pande with Jury Demand filed by Michael Cheney. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(ej) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less