This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2019 at 07:01:38 (UTC).

Chegg, Inc. v. Doe

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Chegg, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Edward M. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-07194

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nathanael M. Cousins

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chegg, Inc.

Defendant

JOHN DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eileen Regina Ridley

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

555 California Street, Suite 1700

San Francisco, CA 94104

Robert S. Weisbein

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

90 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10016

Jami A. Gekas

Attorney at Foley and Lardner

321 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Proposed Summons. (Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 1/17/2019) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

18 #12

Proposed Order

18 #11

Exhibit J

18 #10

Exhibit I

18 #9

Exhibit H

18 #8

Exhibit G

18 #7

Exhibit F

18 #6

Exhibit E

18 #5

Exhibit D

18 #4

Exhibit C

18 #3

Exhibit B

18 #2

Exhibit A

18 #1

Declaration of Eoin P. Connolly

#18

(#18) Ex Parte Application To Serve Defendant By Alternative Means filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eoin P. Connolly, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 1/17/2019) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#17

(#17) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

16 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#16

(#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12992293.) filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weisbein, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2019) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

15 #1

Complaint

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Proposed Summons. (Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 1/17/2019) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Ex Parte Application To Serve Defendant By Alternative Means filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eoin P. Connolly, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 1/17/2019) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Order by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12992293.) filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Weisbein, Robert) (Filed on 1/10/2019) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/4/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Case REASSIGNED to Judge Edward M. Chen. Judge This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • (#12) This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • (#11) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chegg, Inc... (Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 12/26/2018) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY. Re: Dkt. No. #5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/26/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney Jami Gekas Pro Hac Vice representing Chegg, Inc. #5 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Ex Parte MOTION to Expedite Taking of Discovery filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eileen R. Ridley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Declaration of Eoin Connolly, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Proposed Order)(Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12912466.) filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gekas, Jami) (Filed on 12/10/2018) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/27/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT (Corrected) against John Doe. Filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 11/28/2018) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/12/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) *Filing Error See Corrected Complaint #3 * COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12881129.). Filed by Chegg, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ridley, Eileen) (Filed on 11/28/2018) Modified on 11/29/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHEGG INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert S. Weisbein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jami A Gekas

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eileen R Ridley