This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2019 at 07:54:55 (UTC).

Chatham v. Taliesyn Homes, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 Chatham filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Taliesyn Homes, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02772

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Courtney Chatham

Defendants

Edwin Scruggs

Taliesyn Homes, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bryce William Ashby

Attorney at DONATI LAW FIRM, LLP

1545 Union Ave.

Memphis, TN 38104

Defendant Attorney

Malcolm Brown Futhey, III

Attorney at THE FUTHEY LAW FIRM PLC

1440 Poplar Avenue

Memphis, TN 38104

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Chatham as to Edwin Scruggs. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND RESPONSE TIME #13 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/13/18. (shl) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #2

Summons as to Taliesyn Homes, LLC dba Berkshire Hathaway

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Edwin Scruggs. Edwin Scruggs waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

1 #3

Summons

#13

(#13) MOTION to Extend Deadline to answer or respond to the complaint, unopposed, proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Brown Futhey, III on behalf of All Defendants (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Taliesyn Homes, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Chatham as to Taliesyn Homes, LLC. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Overtime Under the FLSA against Edwin Scruggs, Taliesyn Homes, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2919739), filed by Courtney Chatham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Taliesyn Homes, LLC dba Berkshire Hathaway, #3 Summons)(Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Edwin Scruggs. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#15

(#15) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Taliesyn Homes, LLC. Taliesyn Homes, LLC waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Courtney Chatham (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Courtney Chatham (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, 2/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (tlh) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND RESPONSE TIME #13 . Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/13/18. (shl) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Extend Deadline to answer or respond to the complaint, unopposed, proposed order submitted by All Defendants. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Edwin Scruggs. Edwin Scruggs waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Taliesyn Homes, LLC. Taliesyn Homes, LLC waiver sent on 11/7/2018, answer due 1/7/2019. (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Malcolm Brown Futhey, III on behalf of All Defendants (Futhey, Malcolm) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Chatham as to Taliesyn Homes, LLC. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Chatham as to Edwin Scruggs. (Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Edwin Scruggs. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Taliesyn Homes, LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Overtime Under the FLSA against Edwin Scruggs, Taliesyn Homes, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2919739), filed by Courtney Chatham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Taliesyn Homes, LLC dba Berkshire Hathaway, #3 Summons)(Ashby, Bryce) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.