This case was last updated from PACER on 12/18/2018 at 07:38:14 (UTC).

Charles v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 Charles filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark E. Ford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02175

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark E. Ford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Charles

Waldron, AR 72958

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael Hamby

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 395

Greenwood, AR 72936

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS returned executed as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel and US Attorney General by Jennifer Charles. (hnc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Charles. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (lw) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Jennifer Charles. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Hamby, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Hamby on behalf of Jennifer Charles. (Hamby, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint, 5 Order on Motion for Service, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (mjm) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The clerk is directed to prepare and issue summons for service of the complaint, this order and the summons on the defendant by the MARSHALS SERVICE. The defendant should be served via the Office of Regional Chief Counsel Region IV, SSA, 1302 Young Street, Room 430, Dallas, Texas 75202-5433;the US Attorney General via the U. S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20530-0001, and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas via the Office of the United States Attorney, Western District of Arkansas, 414 Parker Avenue, Fort Smith, Arkansas 72902. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiff is unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on October 19, 2018. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service)(cla) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(mjm) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Jennifer Charles. (mjm) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jennifer Charles. (mjm) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Jennifer Charles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Acition)(mjm) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.