This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2020 at 06:57:51 (UTC).

Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc. v. Frontgate Marketing, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 Charles R Gracie Sons, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Frontgate Marketing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Naomi Reice Buchwald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-09576

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Naomi Reice Buchwald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc.

Defendants

Frontgate Marketing, Inc.

Cornerstone Brands Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessie F. Beeber

Attorney at Venable LLP (NYC)

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Defendant Attorney

Carrie Ann Longstaff

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

#16

#17

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Cornerstone Brands Limited, Frontgate Marketing, Inc.. Document filed by Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 1/30/2019 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ama) Modified on 1/31/2019 (ama). (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is, dismissed without costs and without prejudice to an application to restore the action to this Court's calendar within thirty days if the parties are unable to finalize their settlement in that time. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/30/2019) (ama) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned counsel for the parties that: All deadlines in this matter, including the deadline for Plaintiff's Response may be adjourned pending execution of the settlement and Plaintiff's filing of the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts, and a photocopy or other electronic or scanned copy of any signature and/or such counterparts may be submitted to the Court and shall be binding upon the parties for all purposes as if they were originals; and The parties respectfully request that the Court So Order this Stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/30/2019) (ama) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc.. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Carrie Longstaff dated January 24, 2019. Document filed by Cornerstone Brands Limited, Frontgate Marketing, Inc..(Longstaff, Carrie) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carrie Ann Longstaff on behalf of Cornerstone Brands Limited, Frontgate Marketing, Inc.. (Longstaff, Carrie) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Cornerstone Brands Limited served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Process Manager at Corporation Service Co.. Document filed by Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc.. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Frontgate Marketing, Inc. served on 1/3/2019, answer due 1/24/2019. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Process Manager at Corporation Service Co.. Document filed by Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc.. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER: addressed to Jessie F. Beeber, Esq. from Naomi Reice Buchwald United States District Judge dated 12/17/2018 re: A review of the docket sheet in the above-captioned matter indicates that your complaint was filed on October 18, 2018, and that, as of today's date, the complaint has not been served on the defendants. Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as amended as of December 1, 2015, provides: If a defendant is not served within 90 days after the complaint is filed, the court - on motion or on its own after notice to the plaintiff - must dismiss the action without prejudice against that defendant or order that service be made within a specified time. But if the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure, the court must extend the time for service for an appropriate period. Thus, unless you achieve service ( and file proof of service with the Court) or show good cause why your time to serve should be extended, this matter will be dismissed without prejudice on January 16, 2019.(ama) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cornerstone Brands Limited, Frontgate Marketing, Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jessie F. Beeber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1338. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 17:0101. (sj) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc..(Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Frontgate Marketing, Inc. and Cornerstone Brands Limited, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc.. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Cornerstone Brands Limited, Frontgate Marketing, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15773908)Document filed by Charles R. Gracie & Sons, Inc..(Beeber, Jessie) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cornerstone Brands, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Frontgate Marketing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRIE ANN LONGSTAFF