This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/25/2020 at 16:04:15 (UTC).

Charles Nichols v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2014 Charles Nichols filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gavin Newsom,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    14-55873

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

KAMALA D. HARRIS, Attorney General, Attorney General in her official capacity as Attorney General of California

XAVIER BECERRA, Attorney General in his official capacity as Attorney General of California

GAVIN NEWSOM, in his official capacity as Governor of California

EDMUND G. BROWN, Jr., in his official capacity as Governor of California

Amicus Curiae

EVERYTOWN FOR GUN SAFETY

BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE

LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE

Plaintiff / Appellant

CHARLES NICHOLS

Redondo Beach, CA 90278

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Deepak Gupta

Attorney at Gupta Wessler PLLC

1900 L Street, Nw, Suite 312

Washington, DC 20036

Megan Dixon

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

3 Embarcadero Center

San Francisco, CA 94111

Simon J. Frankel Esquire

Attorney at Covington & Burling, LLP

One Front Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Jonathan Michael Eisenberg

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 South Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Charles Nichols

P. O. Box 1302

Redondo Beach, CA 90278

 

Court Documents

#120

#119

118 #2

Certificate of Service

118 #1

Plaintiff-appellants unopposed motion to clarify the submission status of this a

117 #3

CMECF-Certificate-of-Service

117 #2

TEIXEIRA V. COUNTY OF No. 13-17132 -2017 - en banc decision

117 #1

TEIXEIRA V. COUNTY OF ALAMEDA No. 13-17132 en banc FRAP 28j letter

116 #2

Collins v. Virginia 16-1027

116 #1

Collins v. Virginia - May 29-2018 FRAP 28j letter

5 #2

Certificate of Service

4 #2

Certificate of Service

4 #1

Main Document including Declaration of Charles Nichols

#3

#2

1 #4

Informal Brief Notice

1 #3

Docketing Letter

1 #2

pro se appls

#1

Main Document

265 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • Docket(#121) Appellee Edmund G. Brown Jr. in 14-55873 substituted by Appellee Gavin Newsom in 14-55873 [11223393] (QDL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:50 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#120) Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra Correspondence: Notice of substitution of public officer. Date of service: 03/11/2019. [11223236] [14-55873]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect content of filing. 03/11/2019 by RY] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 03/11/2019 03:03 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#119) Filed order (MARSHA S. BERZON, JAY S. BYBEE and SHARON L. GLEASON) Submission of this case remains vacated pending issuance of the mandate in Young v. Hawaii, No. 12-17808. [11114075] (OC) [Entered: 12/07/2018 01:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#118) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion for miscellaneous relief [Plaintiff-appellants unopposed motion to clarify the submission status of this appeal.]. Date of service: 12/06/2018. [11111621] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 12/06/2018 01:01 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/14/2018. [10908517] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/14/2018 09:46 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/01/2018. [10894135] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/01/2018 04:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/01/2018. [10894131] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 06/01/2018 04:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/31/2018. [10890574] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/31/2018 12:50 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) Filed (ECF) Appellee Xavier Becerra citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/25/2018. [10886404] [14-55873] (Eisenberg, Jonathan) [Entered: 05/25/2018 02:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 05/05/2018. [10862882] [14-55873] (Nichols, Charles) [Entered: 05/05/2018 07:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2014
  • Docket(#10) Streamlined request [9] by Appellees Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Kamala D. Harris to extend time to file the brief is not approved because it is unnecessary. The briefing schedule is stayed. See 9th Cir. R. 32-2. [9362274] (GS) [Entered: 12/24/2014 04:17 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/24/2014
  • Docket(#9) Filed (ECF) Streamlined request for extension of time to file Answering Brief by Appellees Kamala D. Harris and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.. New requested due date is 01/30/2015. [9361612] [14-55873] (JME) [Entered: 12/24/2014 11:24 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Motion for miscellaneous relief [motion to file sur-reply in opposition to motion to stay proceedings with sur-reply attached]. Date of service: 12/15/2014. [9348557] [14-55873] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 12/17/2014 by TL] (CN) [Entered: 12/15/2014 08:02 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris reply to response (). Date of service: 12/08/2014. [9340537] [14-55873] (JME) [Entered: 12/08/2014 01:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review and filed Motion to file oversized brief. Submitted by Appellant Charles Nichols. Date of service: 12/01/2014. [9332447] [14-55873] (CN) [Entered: 12/01/2014 05:51 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols response opposing motion (motion to stay proceedings). Date of service: 11/29/2014. [9329997] [14-55873] (CN) [Entered: 11/29/2014 04:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) Appellant Charles Nichols Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 02/02/2015. Date of service: 11/23/2014. [9323238] [14-55873] (CN) [Entered: 11/23/2014 02:19 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filed (ECF) Appellee Kamala D. Harris Motion to stay proceedings. Date of service: 11/19/2014. [9319541] [14-55873] (JME) [Entered: 11/19/2014 04:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Streamlined request by Appellant Charles Nichols to extend time to file the opening brief is approved. Amended briefing schedule: Appellant Charles Nichols opening brief is due 12/02/2014. Appellees Edmund G. Brown Jr. and Kamala D. Harris, Attorney General answering brief is due 01/02/2015. The optional reply brief is due within 14 days from the date of service of the answering brief. [9278766] (DO)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF APPELLANT IN PRO SE AND COUNSEL FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 06/26/2014. Transcript due 09/24/2014. Appellant Charles Nichols opening brief due 11/03/2014. Appellees Edmund G. Brown Jr. and Kamala D. Harris, Attorney General answering brief due 12/03/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9112138] (BG)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Everytown for Gun Safety is a litigant

Latest cases where BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Nichols