This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2018 at 07:00:53 (UTC).

Chappell Co., Inc. et al v. Tony Spavone Ristorante, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2018 Chappell Co , Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tony Spavone Ristorante, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03917

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chappell Co., Inc.

Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.

Warner Bros., Inc.

Defendants

Tony Spavone Ristorante, Inc.

Anthony Spavone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rachel M. Vorbeck

Attorney at TottisLaw

1 East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60601

Monica L. Thompson

Attorney at TottisLaw

One East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60601

Kevin Tottis

Attorney at TottisLaw

1 East Wacker Drive, Suite 1205

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

Robert C. Samko

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert C. Samko

33 N. Lasalle Street, Suite 2000

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc.. Anthony Spavone waiver sent on 7/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc. as to Tony Spavone Ristorante, Inc. on 6/19/2018, answer due 7/10/2018. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tony Spavone Ristorante, Inc. by Robert C. Samko (Samko, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 8/21/18 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

7 #1

Attachment

#7

(#7) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pk, ) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc. by Rachel M. Vorbeck (Vorbeck, Rachel) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc. by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc. by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit Schedule A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14549714. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A)(Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc.. Anthony Spavone waiver sent on 7/11/2018, answer due 9/10/2018. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc. as to Tony Spavone Ristorante, Inc. on 6/19/2018, answer due 7/10/2018. (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tony Spavone Ristorante, Inc. by Robert C. Samko (Samko, Robert) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 8/21/18 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, ) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pk, ) (Entered: 06/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Anthony Spavone, Tony Spavone Ristorante, Inc. (acm) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc. by Rachel M. Vorbeck (Vorbeck, Rachel) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc. by Kevin Tottis (Tottis, Kevin) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. (acm) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc. by Monica L. Thompson (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Chappell Co., Inc., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., Warner Bros., Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14549714. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A)(Thompson, Monica) (Entered: 06/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chappell-Co, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Polygram International Publising, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant