This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2018 at 07:42:44 (UTC).

Chambly v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 Chambly filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Smith Nephew, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02340

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grace B Chambly

Defendant

Smith & Nephew, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Keith Jenner

Attorney at Jenner Law, P.C.

1829 Reisterstown Road, Suite 350

Baltimore, MD 21208

 

Court Documents

#30

(#31) ORDER Confirming dates set at the status conference held on September 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/27/2018 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#31

(#29) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 10 THA Track Master Amended Consolidated Complaints and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/24/2018 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

29 #3

Exhibit B (THA Track Short Form Complaint for R3-THA Cases)

29 #2

Exhibit A (THA Track Short Form Complaint not Involving the R3 Metal Liner)

29 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #2

Exhibit B (THA Track Cases)

3 #1

Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases)

3 #976

(#30) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#4

(#28) STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for September 25, 2018 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

17 #2

Exhibit B (THA Track Cases)

17 #1

Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases)

16 #2

Exhibit B (THA Track Cases)

16 #1

Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases)

16 #867

(#4) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#15

(#3) MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 44 transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#13

(#2) ORDER Confirming the results of the status conference held on July 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/31/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7474335.), filed by Grace B Chambly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02340, 1:17-md-02775-CCB(Jenner, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

60 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER Confirming dates set at the status conference held on September 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/27/2018 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 10 THA Track Master Amended Consolidated Complaints and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/24/2018 Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for September 25, 2018 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Consent MOTION for Other Relief for Entry of Case Management Order No. 10 (THA Track Master Amended Consolidated Complaints and Motion to Dismiss) by Smith and Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (THA Track Short Form Complaint not Involving the R3 Metal Liner), #3 Exhibit B (THA Track Short Form Complaint for R3-THA Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) STIPULATION of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Smith & Nephew, Limited and Smith & Nephew, PLC by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER Confirming schedule set at the August 29, 2018 status conference. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/17/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Substantive legal issues - addressing Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Ward, Jasper) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint MOTION re (88 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) Protective/Confidentiality Order for Entry of Supplement to Protective Order Regarding Confidential Information from Foreign Countries by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Supplement to Protective Order))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MDL Certified Transfer ORDER No. 44 transferring the attached case to the District of Maryland Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER Confirming the results of the status conference held on July 25, 2018. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/31/2018. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • Cases associated: Create association to 1:17-md-02775-CCB. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7474335.), filed by Grace B Chambly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-02340, 1:17-md-02775-CCB(Jenner, Robert) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less