This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:25 (UTC).

Chambers v. State of Florida

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Chambers filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Florida. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie S. Sneed and Steven D. Merryday. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02142

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Julie S. Sneed

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Merryday

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony Chambers

Sarasota, FL 34230

Defendant

State of Florida

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #6 Order to file proof of indigency by Anthony Chambers. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of dismissal with prejudice by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

9 #1

Mailing Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against State of Florida filed by Anthony Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Filing State Court Files by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER directing Chambers, by 11/2/2018, either to pay the filing fee or to file proof of indigency. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/5/2018. (BK) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#10

(#10) TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (CTR) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

7 #1

Mailing Envelope

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Dismissal by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

8 #1

Mailing Envelope

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Filing State Court Files by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

3 #1

Mailing Envelope

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) TRANSMITTAL of initial appeal package to USCA consisting of copies of notice of appeal, docket sheet, order/judgment being appealed, and motion, if applicable to USCA re #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (CTR) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #6 Order to file proof of indigency by Anthony Chambers. Filing fee not paid. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE for Nelson Hearing with Exhibits: A-B-C-D by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of dismissal with prejudice by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER directing Chambers, by 11/2/2018, either to pay the filing fee or to file proof of indigency. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 10/5/2018. (BK) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Filing State Court Files by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Dismissal by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Filing State Court Files by Anthony Chambers (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 1. (GSO) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against State of Florida filed by Anthony Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.