This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2018 at 07:25:25 (UTC).

Century-National Insurance Company, et al v. Gardner, et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 Century-National Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gardner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Peggy A. Leen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02090

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Peggy A. Leen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company

Pacific Pioneer Insurance Group, Inc.

UCA General Insurance Services

Century-National Insurance Company

Defendants

Douglas J. Gardner

Douglas J. Gardner, LTD

Rands & South, LTD

ALPS Corporation

ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John A. Marshall

Attorney at Marshall & Associates

26565 W. Agoura Road, Suite 200

Calabasas, CA 91302

Betsy C. Jefferis

Attorney at Phillips Spallas & Angstdt

504 S. Ninth Street, Suite 115

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Mark S. Reusch

Attorney at Marshall & Associates

26565 W. Agoura Road, Suite 200

Calabasas, CA 91302

john A marshall

Attorney at Marshall & Associates

26565 W. Agoura Rd., Ste. 200

Calabasas, CA 91316

Mark S Reusch

Attorney at Marshall & Associates

26565 W. Agoura Road, Suite 200

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

David A. Clark

Attorney at Lipson Neilson PC

9900 Covington Cross Dr. Suite 120

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Joseph P Garin

Attorney at Lipson Neilson P.C.

9900 Covington Cross Drive, Suite 120

Las Vegas, NV 89144

Thomas D Dillard

Attorney at Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski

9950 West Cheyenne Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89129

James R. Olson

Attorney at Olson, Cannon, Gormley, Angulo & Stoberski

9950 West Cheyenne Avenue

Las Vegas, NV 89129

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#20

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

#2

1 #5

Summons Rands & South, Ltd.

1 #4

Summons - Douglas J. Gardner, Esq.

1 #3

Summons - Douglas J. Gardner, Ltd.

1 #2

Summons - ALPS

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs by Century-National Insurance Company. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 3/21/2019.(marshall, john) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER Granting #23 Stipulation re #1 Complaint. Plaintiffs shall forthwith separately file the first amended complaint which is attached as an exhibit to the stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER Granting #22 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (Third Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Century-National Insurance Company. (marshall, john) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 COMPLAINT; filed by Plaintiff Century-National Insurance Company. (marshall, john) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/11/2018.ERROR: The #20 Stipulation does not comply with LR IA 6-2 which states, in part, that the signature block must not begin on a separate page.CORRECTION: Counsel shall review LR IA 6-2 in its entirety, shall ensure that the signature block is in compliance with the Local Rules, and shall refile the stipulation under event "Notice of Corrected Image" linking it to the originally filed #20 Stipulation no later than December 12, 2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Century-National Insurance Company. (marshall, john) Modified on 12/11/2018 to add docket entry relationship (DKJ). (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER Granting #18 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) First STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint by Defendant Douglas J. Gardner, LTD. (Clark, David) Modified on 11/27/2018 to add docket entry relationship (DKJ). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ALPS Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate ALPS Property and Casualty Insurance Company for ALPS Corporation added. (Dillard, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark S. Reusch for Century-National Insurance Company, Pacific Pioneer Insurance Group, Inc., Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company and UCA General Services and approving Designation of Local Counsel Betsy C. Jefferis. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John A. Marshall for Century-National Insurance Company, Pacific Pioneer Insurance Group, Inc., Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company and UCA General Services and approving Designation of Local Counsel Betsy C. Jefferis. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/5/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark Steven Reusch and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Betsy C. Jefferis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5306225) by Plaintiff Century-National Insurance Company. (Jefferis, Betsy) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John Alexander Marshall and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Betsy C. Jefferis (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5306201) by Plaintiff Century-National Insurance Company. (Jefferis, Betsy) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/1/2018. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to ALPS Corporation, Douglas J. Gardner, LTD, Douglas J. Gardner, Rands & South, LTD. (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John A. Marshall and Mark S. Reusch to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/15/2018. (no image attached) (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Century-National Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jefferis, Betsy) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5304505) by Century-National Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 1/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - ALPS, #3 Summons - Douglas J. Gardner, Ltd., #4 Summons Douglas J. Gardner, Esq., #5 Summons Rands & South, Ltd.)(Jefferis, Betsy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pacific Pioneer Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where ALPS Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Century National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Clark