This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2020 at 21:08:03 (UTC).

Centex Homes v. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 Centex Homes filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against St Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-02407

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Centex Homes

Defendants, Cross Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

Federal Insurance Company

Interstate Fire & Casualty Company

St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company

Everest National Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

Admiral Insurance Company

Defendant, Counter Defendant, Cross Claimant, Cross Defendant and Counter Claimant

Everest National Insurance Company

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company

3Rd Party Defendants

New Hampshire Insurance Company

Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company

Probuilders Specialty Insurance Company, RRG

First Specialty Insurance Company

Rockhill Insurance Companh

Fireman's Fund Insurance Company

Underwriters at Lloyds London

Arch Specialty Insurance Company

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sarah J. Odia

Attorney at Payne & Fears, LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Ste. 220

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Scott S Thomas

Attorney at Payne & Fears LLP

4 Park Plaza, Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92614

Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff, Counter Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ramiro Morales

Attorney at Morales, Fierro & Reeves

600 S. Tonopah Drive, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Benjamin J Carman

Attorney at Carman Cooney Forbush PLLC

4045 Spencer Street A47

Las Vegas, NV 89119

William C. Reeves

Attorney at Morales, Fierro & Reeves

600 S. Tonopah Drive, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Todd Haas

Attorney at Selman Breitman

101 W Broadway Ste 1330

San Diego, CA 92101

Wendy Marie Schenk

Attorney at Selman Breitman

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

David A. Astengo

Attorney at Selman Breitman LLP

33 New Montgomery, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94105

Christine Magarian

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

11755 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Joshua Zlotlow

Attorney at Herold & Sager

3960 Howard Hughes Pkwy, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Stephanie Joy Smith

Attorney at Moran Brandon Bendavid Moran

630 S. Fourth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Andrew Waxler

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

11755 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jeffrey A. Bendavid

Attorney at Moran & Associates

630 S Fourth St Ste 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Max Gerald Garcia

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith

633 West 5Th St., Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Jeffrey D. Olster

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

6385 S. Rainbow Blvd., Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89118

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Counter Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Todd Haas

Attorney at Selman Breitman

101 W Broadway Ste 1330

San Diego, CA 92101

Wendy Marie Schenk

Attorney at Selman Breitman

33 New Montgomery, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

David A. Astengo

Attorney at Selman Breitman LLP

33 New Montgomery, Suite 600

San Francisco, CA 94105

Benjamin J Carman

Attorney at Carman Cooney Forbush PLLC

4045 Spencer Street A47

Las Vegas, NV 89119

Christine Magarian

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

11755 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Joshua Zlotlow

Attorney at Herold & Sager

3960 Howard Hughes Pkwy, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Stephanie Joy Smith

Attorney at Moran Brandon Bendavid Moran

630 S. Fourth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Andrew Waxler

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

11755 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jeffrey A. Bendavid

Attorney at Moran & Associates

630 S Fourth St Ste 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Ramiro Morales

Attorney at Morales, Fierro & Reeves

600 S. Tonopah Drive, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89106

William C. Reeves

Attorney at Morales, Fierro & Reeves

600 S. Tonopah Drive, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Defendant, Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Christine Magarian

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

11755 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Joshua Zlotlow

Attorney at Herold & Sager

3960 Howard Hughes Pkwy, Suite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Stephanie Joy Smith

Attorney at Moran Brandon Bendavid Moran

630 S. Fourth Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Andrew Waxler

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

11755 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jeffrey A. Bendavid

Attorney at Moran & Associates

630 S Fourth St Ste 400

Las Vegas, NV 89101

John H. Podesta

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

300 South Fourth Street, 11Th Floor

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Laleaque Grad

Attorney at Grad Law Firm

8275 South Eastern Ave,, Suite 200-352

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Timothy J Lepore

Attorney at Ropers, Majeski, Kohn & Bentley

3753 Howard Hughes Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Kevin R Stolworthy

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale

3770 Howard Hughes Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Michelle D Alarie

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

3770 Howard Hughes Pkwy., Ste. 200

Las Vegas, NV 89169

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#233

232 #4

Exhibit C

232 #3

Exhibit B

232 #2

Exhibit A

232 #1

Declaration of Timothy J. Lepore

226 #15

Exhibit M

226 #7

Exhibit E

226 #5

Exhibit C

226 #4

Exhibit B

#4

#3

2 #4

Summons

2 #3

Summons

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

301 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#233) MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin C. Brantley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott S. Thomas (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5821805) by Plaintiff Centex Homes. (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#232) REPLY to Response to #226 Motion to Compel,, by ThirdParty Defendant Underwriters at Lloyds London. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy J. Lepore, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Lepore, Timothy) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#231) RESPONSE to #226 Motion to Compel,, by Plaintiff Centex Homes. Replies due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Scott S. Thomas, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Thomas, Scott) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#230) ORDER granting #229 Stipulation; Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Motions due by 6/29/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#229) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Sixth or more Request) re Discovery For Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines re #212 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Centex Homes. (Odia, Sarah) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#228) ORDER granting #227 Stipulation; Re: #226 Motion to Compel, Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#227) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Deadline For Centex's Opposition And Underwriters' Reply To #226 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Centex Homes. (Odia, Sarah) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#226) MOTION to Compel Centex Homes To Respond To Certain Interrogatories and Deem Certain Requests for Admission Admitted by ThirdParty Defendant Underwriters at Lloyds London. Responses due by 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy J. Lepore, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M) (Lepore, Timothy) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#225) ORDER granting #221 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/25/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#224) ORDER granting #219 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice as to Rockhill Insurance Company; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
214 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Mailing re #1 Complaint SUMMONS Returned Executed, filed by Centex Homes. St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Odia, Sarah) Court Modified event on 9/27/2017 (TR). (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Mailing re #1 Complaint SUMMONS Returned Executed, filed by Centex Homes. Lexington Insurance Company served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Odia, Sarah) Court Modified event on 9/27/2017 (TR). (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Notice of Mailing re #1 Complaint SUMMONS Returned Executed, filed by Centex Homes. Interstate Fire & Casualty Company served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Odia, Sarah) Court Modified event on 9/27/2017 (TR). (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Mailing re #1 Complaint SUMMONS Returned Executed, filed by Centex Homes. Federal Insurance Company served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Odia, Sarah) Court Modified event on 9/27/2017 (TR). (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Mailing re #1 ComplaintSUMMONS Returned Executed, filed by Centex Homes . Everest National Insurance Company served on 9/25/2017, answer due 10/16/2017. (Odia, Sarah) Court Modified event on 9/27/2017 (TR). (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Centex Homes that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Centex Real Estate Corporation, Other Affiliate Pulte Home Corporation, Other Affiliate Nomas LLC, Other Affiliate Centex International II, LLC, Other Affiliate Centex LLC for Centex Homes added. . (Odia, Sarah) (Entered: 09/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiff Centex Homes. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Odia, Sarah) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JM) (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4773837), filed by Centex Homes. Proof of service due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Odia, Sarah) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROBUILDERS SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY RRG is a litigant

Latest cases where Admiral Insurance Group is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where Centex Homes n/k/a Pulte Home Company, LLC is a litigant