Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2018 at 07:53:04 (UTC).

Cellular Transitions, LLC v. Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2018 Cellular Transitions, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Huawei Device Hong Kong Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodney Gilstrap. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00387

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cellular Transitions, LLC

Defendants

Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd

Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd.

Huawei Technologies USA Inc.

Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.

Huawei Device USA Inc.

Huawei Device Co., Ltd.

Huawei Device (Shenzen) Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

L. Charles Van Cleef

Attorney at Van Cleef Law Office

Po Box 2432

Longview, TX 75606-2432

Margaret Elizabeth Day

Attorney at Feinberg Day Alberti & Thompson LLP - Menlo Park

1600 El Camino Real, Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

David L Alberti

Attorney at Feinberg Day Alberti & Thompson LLP - Menlo Park

1600 El Camino Real, Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Marc Belloli

Attorney at Feinberg Day Alberti & Thompson LLP - Menlo Park

1600 El Camino Real, Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Sal Lim

Attorney at Feinberg Day Alberti & Thompson LLP - Menlo Park

1600 El Camino Real, Suite 280

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Defendant Attorney

Steven Mark Geiszler

Attorney at Futurewei Technologies, Inc

5340 Legacy Drive, Suite 175

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER granting #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until December 18, 2018. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2018. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Partial Dismissal) as to Defendants Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd, Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., and Huawei Technologies USA Inc without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2018. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

16 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#16

(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Partial Dismissal) as to Defendants Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd, Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., and Huawei Technologies USA Inc. by Cellular Transitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until December 18, 2018 by Huawei Device USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cellular Transitions, LLC. Huawei Device (Shenzen) Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 9/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cellular Transitions, LLC. Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 9/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Device (Shenzen) Co., Ltd.. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Device USA Inc. C/O CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret Elizabeth Day on behalf of Cellular Transitions, LLC (Day, Margaret) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Transitions, LLC. (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Transitions, LLC (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd., Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd, Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6931088.), filed by Cellular Transitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until December 18, 2018. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2018. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #16 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Partial Dismissal) as to Defendants Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd, Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., and Huawei Technologies USA Inc without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/11/2018. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Partial Dismissal) as to Defendants Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd, Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., and Huawei Technologies USA Inc. by Cellular Transitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until December 18, 2018 by Huawei Device USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cellular Transitions, LLC. Huawei Device (Shenzen) Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 9/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cellular Transitions, LLC. Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 9/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018. (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Device (Shenzen) Co., Ltd.. (ch, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd., Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Device (Shenzen) Co., Ltd., filed by Cellular Transitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Huawei Technologies USA Inc. to 11/9/2018; Huawei Device USA Inc. to 11/9/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Huawei Device USA Inc., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. (Geiszler, Steven) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marc Belloli on behalf of Cellular Transitions, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6934332. (Belloli, Marc) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David L Alberti on behalf of Cellular Transitions, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6934286. (Alberti, David) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Huawei Device USA Inc. C/O CT Corporation System. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (nkl, ) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Margaret Elizabeth Day on behalf of Cellular Transitions, LLC (Day, Margaret) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Transitions, LLC. (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Transitions, LLC (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd., Huawei Device (Hong Kong) Co., Ltd, Huawei Device Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd., Huawei Technologies USA Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6931088.), filed by Cellular Transitions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Van Cleef, L.) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Huawei Device USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Mark Geiszler