This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/31/2020 at 16:55:57 (UTC).

Cellspin Soft, Inc. v. TomTom, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 Cellspin Soft, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against TomTom, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth D. Laporte and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:17-CV-05937

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Elizabeth D. Laporte

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cellspin Soft, Inc.

Defendants

TomTom, Inc.

TomTom North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John J. Edmonds

Attorney at Edmonds & Schlather, PLLC

355 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2450

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Charles C Carson

Attorney at Baker Hostetler, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave., Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Michael Edward Anderson

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler

1050 Connecticut Ave. Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Teresa Carey Chow

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

 

Court Documents

#49

#48

#47

#46

#43

#5

#4

#3

#83

69 #1

Supplement

69 #68

#47

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - 9,749,847 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit C - 9,258,698 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - 8,892,752 Patent

1 #1

Exhibit A - 8,738,794 Patent

#1

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • Docket(#54) CLERK'S NOTICE. The Order at Dkt. 53 dated 8/19/19 was entered in error in this case as this case was Dismissed per Stipulation and Order of 1/25/18, Dkt. no. 47; case closed. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ***FILED IN ERROR IN THIS CASE. THIS CASE DISMISSED PER STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF 1/25/18, DKT. NO. 47*** ORDER. Parties who have not answered the first amended complaint are to do so by 8/30/2019. Specially set Case Management Conference shall be held on Wednesday, 10/9/2019 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement as explained in this Order to be filed by 9/25/2019. Counsel to file by 10/4/2019 a joint notice which identifies all counsel and the parties they represent that will be appearing at the case management conference on 10/9/2019. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/19/2019. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2019) Modified on 8/20/2019 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) **** MINUTES FILED IN ERROR IN THIS CASE. THIS CASE IS CLOSED.**** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Motion Hearing held and submitted on 3/6/2018 re (41 in 4:17-cv-05933-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Cellspin Soft, Inc's Complaints filed by Misfit Inc., Fossil Group, Inc., (34 in 4:17-cv-05941-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Cellspin Soft, Inc.'s Complaints filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, (31 in 4:17-cv-05928-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Complaints filed by Fitbit, Inc., (29 in 4:17-cv-05929-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Complaints filed by Moov Inc., (28 in 4:17-cv-05931-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Complaints filed by Nike, Inc., (52 in 4:17-cv-05933-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Cellspin Soft, Inc's Amended Complaint filed by Misfit Inc., Fossil Group, Inc., (34 in 4:17-cv-05937-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Cellspin Soft, Inc.'s Complaints filed by TomTom, Inc., (33 in 4:17-cv-05932-YGR, 33 in 4:17-cv-05932-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss and/or MOTION to Strike (24) Answer to Complaint (Under Armour's Ninth Affirmative Defense) filed by Cellspin Soft, Inc., (24 in 4:17-cv-06881-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Cellspin Soft, Inc.'s Complaints filed by JK Imaging Ltd., (27 in 4:17-cv-05934-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(c) filed by Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., (31 in 4:17-cv-05939-YGR) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaints filed by GoPro, Inc. Total Time in Court: 1:12 [total time for related cases]. Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement: List of Attorney Appearances)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/6/2018) Modified on 3/16/2018 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • Docket(#51) CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE FRIDAY, MARCH 2, 2018 AT 9:01AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Transcript of Proceedings held on January 29, 2018, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, telephone number 925-899-2812, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (41 in 4:17-cv-05936-YGR) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/10/2018. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 2/9/2018) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/2/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearing re (33 in 4:17-cv-05934-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (36 in 4:17-cv-05939-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (39 in 4:17-cv-05932-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (36 in 4:17-cv-05929-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (38 in 4:17-cv-06881-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (35 in 4:17-cv-05931-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (38 in 4:17-cv-05930-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (38 in 4:17-cv-05938-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (50 in 4:17-cv-05933-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (39 in 4:17-cv-05941-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, (42 in 4:17-cv-05928-YGR) Case Management Conference - Initial, Further Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2018 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Claims Construction Hearing set for Monday, 11/19/2018 09:00 AM. Compliance hearing set for 3/2/2018 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Filing by 2/23/2018. Tutorial Hearing set for Friday, 10/26/2018 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) REPORT on the determination of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2018) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO TOMTOM NORTH AMERICA, INC. re #43 Stipulation filed by Cellspin Soft, Inc. TomTom North America terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/25/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER GRANTING #42 AMENDED Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant TomTom, Inc.filed by Cellspin Soft, Inc. Defendant TomTom, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/25/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018) (Entered: 01/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. (Edmonds, John) (Filed on 10/20/2017) (Entered: 10/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Cellspin Soft, Inc. (Edmonds, John) (Filed on 10/19/2017) (Entered: 10/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ERRATA re #1 Complaint,, Correct Version of the Exhibits by Cellspin Soft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8,738,794 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - 8,892,752 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - 9,258,698 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - 9,749,847 Patent)(Edmonds, John) (Filed on 10/19/2017) (Entered: 10/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Cellspin Soft, Inc. Can Not open Part 1 Exhibit A and Part 2 Exhibit B (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017) (Entered: 10/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding :PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2017) (Entered: 10/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/9/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 10/17/17. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017) (Entered: 10/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Cellspin Soft, Inc. . (Edmonds, John) (Filed on 10/17/2017) (Entered: 10/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic filing error. Please complete and docket the court's latest version of the civil cover sheet available on the court's website. Please use the docketing event civil cover sheet. Thank you. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Cellspin Soft, Inc. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017) (Entered: 10/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/31/2017. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017) (Entered: 10/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR INFRINGEMENT OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 8,738,794, 8,892,752, 9,258,698, AND 9,749,847; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; (NO PROCESS); against TomTom North America, TomTom, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11802045.). Filed byCellspin Soft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1See Docket Number #6 for Correct Attachment Exhibit A - 8,738,794 Patent, #2 See Docket Number #6 for Correct Attachment Exhibit B - 8,892,752 Patent, #3See Docket Number #6 for Correct Attachment Exhibit C - 9,258,698 Patent, #4 See Docket Number #6 for Correct Attachment Exhibit D - 9,749,847 Patent, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edmonds, John) (Filed on 10/16/2017) Modified on 10/18/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/20/2017 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cellspin Soft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TOMTOM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TomTom North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles C. Carson Esq.