This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 08:00:49 (UTC).

Ceasar v. Wells Fargo Bank

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Ceasar filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Marcia A. Crone and Zack Hawthorn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00479

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia A. Crone

Referral Judge

Zack Hawthorn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R Ceasar

Opelousas, LA 70571

Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by R Ceasar on 10/12/18 of #3 Order. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by R Ceasar. (aam, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by R Ceasar. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, filed by R Ceasar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(aam, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#8

(#8) EXHIBITS to complaint #1 by R Ceasar. (mrp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#7

(#7) Letter from R Ceasar requesting issuance of subpoena. (mrp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO PAY FILING FEE. It is ordered that Plaintiff Ceasar pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. If Ceasar believes he is unable to pay the filing fee at this time, he is ordered to complete AO 239 in forma pauperis application and submit the form to the clerk of court within 30 days of the date of this order. Order/AO239 sent CMRRR to pla 10/10/18 Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/9/18. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER SETTING HEARING. A Motion and Evidentiary Hearing is set for 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. The Defendant may attend, but given the limited scope and purpose of the hearing will not be allowed to cross-examine the Plaintiff. Order send to pla CMRRR 10/30/18 Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/30/18. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EXHIBITS to complaint #1 by R Ceasar. (mrp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from R Ceasar requesting issuance of subpoena. (mrp, ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER SETTING HEARING. A Motion and Evidentiary Hearing is set for 11/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Ctrm 4 (Beaumont) before Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. The Defendant may attend, but given the limited scope and purpose of the hearing will not be allowed to cross-examine the Plaintiff. Order send to pla CMRRR 10/30/18 Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/30/18. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by R Ceasar. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by R Ceasar on 10/12/18 of #3 Order. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO PAY FILING FEE. It is ordered that Plaintiff Ceasar pay the $400 filing fee within 30 days of the date of this order. If Ceasar believes he is unable to pay the filing fee at this time, he is ordered to complete AO 239 in forma pauperis application and submit the form to the clerk of court within 30 days of the date of this order. Order/AO239 sent CMRRR to pla 10/10/18 Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 10/9/18. (mrp, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by R Ceasar. (aam, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn pursuant to GO 05-07 (aam, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, filed by R Ceasar. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(aam, ) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.