This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2018 at 07:51:34 (UTC).

Cash v. Desantis et al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2018 Cash filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Desantis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Travis R McDonough and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00145

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheila Cash

Defendants

DPI Group, LLC

Angela S Bingman

Montgomery, AL 36106

Pasquale Desantis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David N Darnell

Attorney at Dean Greer & Associates

P O Box 3708

Kingsport, TN 37664

Defendant Attorney

Joshua A Wolfe

Attorney at McAngus, Goudelock & Courie, LLC (Knoxville)

520 West Summit Hill Drive, Suite 905

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Other Civil cover sheet

#1

(#11) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. No such street, unable to forward. Mail sent to Angela S Bingman re #1 Notice of Removal, (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2018 at 02:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 08/31/18. (CMH) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#7

(#7) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Angela S Bingman. (BDG, ) Modified on 9/17/2018 (BDG, ). Moved left no new address. (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#16

(#16) ORDER. Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE againstDefendant Angela S. Bingman, or Bingham. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/24/2018. (BDG, ) Order mailed to Bingman. (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/16/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/24/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER regarding Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/18/2018. (TRT, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file a response showing good cause as to why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice as to Ms. Bingman pursuant to Rule 4(m). Plaintiffs response is due on or before October 3, 2018. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/19/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#11

(#11) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. No such street, unable to forward. Mail sent to Angela S Bingman re #1 Notice of Removal, (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by DPI Group, LLC. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 9/5/18. (CMH) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint by DPI Group, LLC, Pasquale Desantis.(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER. Accordingly, this action is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE againstDefendant Angela S. Bingman, or Bingham. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/24/2018. (BDG, ) Order mailed to Bingman. (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9/16/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2019 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1A - Chattanooga before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/24/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER regarding Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 10/18/2018. (TRT, ) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file a response showing good cause as to why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice as to Ms. Bingman pursuant to Rule 4(m). Plaintiffs response is due on or before October 3, 2018. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 9/19/2018. (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. No such street, unable to forward. Mail sent to Angela S Bingman re #1 Notice of Removal, (BDG, ) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Corporate Interest by DPI Group, LLC. (Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by DPI Group, LLC. (JCK) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 02:00 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 9/5/18. (CMH) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to Complaint by DPI Group, LLC, Pasquale Desantis.(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Angela S Bingman. (BDG, ) Modified on 9/17/2018 (BDG, ). Moved left no new address. (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/25/2018 at 02:30 PM in Video Conference Room before District Judge Travis R. McDonough.Signed by District Judge Travis R. McDonough on 08/31/18. (CMH) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by DPI Group, LLC. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Copy of NOR and other documents mailed to deft Angela S. Bingman at last known address (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Motions To DismissSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential InformationSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing DepositionsSigned by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/2018. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • District Judge Travis R McDonough and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (DJH, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sullivan County Circuit Court, case number C3720. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3754671), filed by DPI Group, LLC, Pasquale Desantis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Other Civil cover sheet)(Wolfe, Joshua) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.