This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2018 at 07:40:47 (UTC).

Casey v. Gartland et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 Casey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gartland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Wallace Capel, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00890

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christy Casey

Defendants

Cassandra Miller

James Gartland

Christopher Webster

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Henry F. Sherrod, III

Attorney at Henry F. Sherrod III, PC

119 S. Court Street

Florence, AL 35630

Alan Bart Lasseter

Attorney at The Lasseter Law Firm

The Kress Building, 301 19Th Street North, Suite 580

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

Steven Keith Herndon

Attorney at Herndon Law PC

1430 I-85 Parkway, Suite 234

Montgomery, AL 36106

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

#14

(#14) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to James Gartland, Christopher Webster, & Cassandra Miller; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#16

(#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, Christopher Webster re #14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Herndon, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Additional Time; Dfts shall file their answer or other responsive pleading on or before 12/17/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/16/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Additional Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, Christopher Webster. (Herndon, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, & Christopher Webster. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

1 #1

request for service by certified mail

1 #2

civil cover sheet

1 #3

fee receipt

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, Christopher Webster ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051059.), filed by Christy Casey. (Attachments: #1 request for service by certified mail, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Keith Herndon on behalf of All Defendants (Herndon, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#10

(#10) Alias Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Christopher Webster by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Forwarding Time Expired." New address for Christopher Webster noted on return envelope. Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#8

(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Christopher Webster for Christopher Webster served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/22/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 11/5/2018 to correct date to 11/1/2018, not 10/1/2018. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#9

(#9) Alias Summons issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Christopher Webster. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#7

(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by James Gartland for James Gartland served on (no date given), answer due 11/20/2018. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#6

(#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Christy Casey for Cassandra Miller served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Modified on 11/1/2018 to clarify text to reflect as return receipt card (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, Christopher Webster and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Christy Casey; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, Christopher Webster re #14 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Herndon, Steven) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Additional Time; Dfts shall file their answer or other responsive pleading on or before 12/17/2018. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/16/2018. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to James Gartland, Christopher Webster, & Cassandra Miller; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(alm, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, & Christopher Webster. (alm, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Additional Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, Christopher Webster. (Herndon, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Keith Herndon on behalf of All Defendants (Herndon, Steven) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Alias Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Christopher Webster by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Forwarding Time Expired." New address for Christopher Webster noted on return envelope. Counsel notified electronically by this docket entry. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re #8 Return Receipt Card. The referenced docket entry was modified to correct the date served to 11/1/2018 and the answer date reset to 11/22/2018. The wrong date was noted on the green card return receipt. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • Reset Answer Deadline, incorrect date noted on green card return receipt and in docket text: Christopher Webster answer due 11/22/2018. (dmn, ) (NO PDF) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Alias Summons issued; summons and complaint mailed CMRRR to Christopher Webster. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint and summons signed by Christopher Webster for Christopher Webster served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/22/2018. (dmn, ) Modified on 11/5/2018 to correct date to 11/1/2018, not 10/1/2018. (dmn, ) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by James Gartland for James Gartland served on (no date given), answer due 11/20/2018. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons & complaint signed by Christy Casey for Cassandra Miller served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Modified on 11/1/2018 to clarify text to reflect as return receipt card (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, Christopher Webster and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Christy Casey re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sherrod, Henry) Modified on 11/16/2018 to add the link to the #3 Notice (alm, ). (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Christy Casey; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Christy Casey. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Christy Casey.(NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against James Gartland, Cassandra Miller, Christopher Webster ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602051059.), filed by Christy Casey. (Attachments: #1 request for service by certified mail, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.