This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2018 at 08:20:41 (UTC).

Casaday v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 Casaday filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04086

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Earl B. Casaday, Sr.

Defendants, Cross Claimants and Counter Claimants

The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.

Adriann Johnson

Defendant and Cross Defendant

Adriann Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Sabrina Lee LaFleur-Sayler

Attorney at Crary Huff Law Firm

711 Sioux Point Road, Suite 200

Dakota Dunes, SD 57049

Defendant, Cross Claimant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Meghann M. Joyce

Attorney at Goosmann Law Firm

5010 South Minnesota Avenue, Suite 100

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Derek A. Nelsen

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Molly K. Beck

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Derek A. Nelsen

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Molly K. Beck

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) The Prudential Insurance Company of America's ANSWER to #4 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, CROSSCLAIM for Interpleader against Adriann Johnson, COUNTERCLAIM against Earl B. Casaday, Sr by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1) - Group Policy and Amendments, #2 Exhibit A (Part 2) - Group Policy and Amendments, #3 Exhibit B - Servicemembers Group Life Insurance Election and Cert of Coverage, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Death, #5 Exhibit D - Claim for Death Benefits Johnson, #6 Exhibit E - Emails and Text re Change of Beneficiary, #7 Exhibit F - Claim for Death Benefits Casaday, #8 Exhibit G - Servicemembers Group Life Insurance Election and Cert of Coverage) (Joyce, Meghann) Modified to add link on 8/2/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 08/01/2018)

10 #8

Exhibit G - Servicemembers Group Life Insurance Election and Cert of Coverage

10 #1

Exhibit A (Part 1) - Group Policy and Amendments

10 #4

Exhibit C - Certificate of Death

10 #5

Exhibit D - Claim for Death Benefits Johnson

10 #2

Exhibit A (Part 2) - Group Policy and Amendments

10 #3

Exhibit B - Servicemembers Group Life Insurance Election and Cert of Coverage

10 #6

Exhibit E - Emails and Text re Change of Beneficiary

10 #7

Exhibit F - Claim for Death Benefits Casaday

#16

(#16) ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim by Earl B. Casaday, Sr. (LaFleur-Sayler, Sabrina) Modified text on 8/23/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Adriann Johnson. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The parties' discovery report is due 9/27/18. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/8/18. (DJP) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #10 Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.'s Crossclaim by Adriann Johnson. (Nelsen, Derek) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/1/18. (JLS) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

4 #1

Exhibit 1 - state court pleadings

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed in shell case on 7/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state court pleadings)(Nelsen, Derek) Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Lee LaFleur-Sayler on behalf of Earl B. Casaday, Sr. (LaFleur-Sayler, Sabrina) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ANSWER to #10 Counterclaim by Earl B. Casaday, Sr. (LaFleur-Sayler, Sabrina) Modified text on 8/23/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The parties' discovery report is due 9/27/18. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/8/18. (DJP) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #10 Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.'s Crossclaim by Adriann Johnson. (Nelsen, Derek) Modified text on 8/8/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Adriann Johnson. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/1/18. (JLS) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc., The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) The Prudential Insurance Company of America's ANSWER to #4 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, CROSSCLAIM for Interpleader against Adriann Johnson, COUNTERCLAIM against Earl B. Casaday, Sr by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1) - Group Policy and Amendments, #2 Exhibit A (Part 2) - Group Policy and Amendments, #3 Exhibit B - Servicemembers Group Life Insurance Election and Cert of Coverage, #4 Exhibit C - Certificate of Death, #5 Exhibit D - Claim for Death Benefits Johnson, #6 Exhibit E - Emails and Text re Change of Beneficiary, #7 Exhibit F - Claim for Death Benefits Casaday, #8 Exhibit G - Servicemembers Group Life Insurance Election and Cert of Coverage) (Joyce, Meghann) Modified to add link on 8/2/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina Lee LaFleur-Sayler on behalf of Earl B. Casaday, Sr. (LaFleur-Sayler, Sabrina) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Adriann Johnson. (Nelsen, Derek) Modified to add link on 7/30/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 07/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc. of Consent to Removal. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Meghann M. Joyce on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Inc.. (Joyce, Meghann) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed in shell case on 7/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - state court pleadings)(Nelsen, Derek) Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Filing Error: #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • (#3) Filing Fee Received from Adriann Johnson. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #0869-2832301. (DJP) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) (FILED IN ERROR) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP) Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adriann Johnson from Lincoln County, case number Unknown. Filed in shell case on 7/18/19. (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons and Verified Complaint for Declaratory Judgment)(DJP) Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP). Modified on 7/19/2018 (DJP). (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.