This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:33:13 (UTC).

Carter v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Carter filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Herman N Johnson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01380

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth R. Carter

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Oscar Monfort Price, IV

Attorney at PRICE-ARMSTRONG LLC

2421 2Nd Avenue North Suite 1

Birmingham, AL 35203

Maxwell H Pulliam

301 19Th Street North, Suite 519, The Kress Building

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorney

Michael N Wilcove

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 14198, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 10/22/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by United States of America. (Wilcove, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth R. Carter. United States of America served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth R. Carter. United States of America served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE by Elizabeth R. Carter of Filing Redacted Exhibit C to Complaint (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Elizabeth R. Carter of Filing Redacted Exhibit B to Complaint (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Seal Exhibits B and C to Complaint, MOTION to Seal Document by Elizabeth R. Carter. (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail as to Jay Town filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (BJL) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#2

(#2) Request for service as to Attorney General Jeff Sessions by certified mail filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (BJL) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against United States of America filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #4 Redacted Exhibit B, #5 Redacted Exhibit C) (BJL, ). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States of America answer due 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/22/18. (LBG, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 10/22/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by United States of America. (Wilcove, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth R. Carter. United States of America served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth R. Carter. United States of America served on 8/31/2018, answer due 9/21/2018. (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by Clerk and delivered to Plaintiff for service. (BJL) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE by Elizabeth R. Carter of Filing Redacted Exhibit C to Complaint (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Elizabeth R. Carter of Filing Redacted Exhibit B to Complaint (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal; granting #5 Motion to Seal Document Exhibits B and C to Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the redacted Exhibits B and C separately, as a notice, by August 31, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/30/18. (LBG, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3161621 (B4601091583). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against United States of America filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BJL). (Pulliam, Maxwell) Modified on 8/30/2018 (BJL, ). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Seal Exhibits B and C to Complaint, MOTION to Seal Document by Elizabeth R. Carter. (Pulliam, Maxwell) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for service by certified mail as to Jay Town filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (BJL) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for service as to Attorney General Jeff Sessions by certified mail filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (BJL) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against United States of America filed by Elizabeth R. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2018: #4 Redacted Exhibit B, #5 Redacted Exhibit C) (BJL, ). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less