This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2018 at 05:48:22 (UTC).

Carson v. Meaker et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 Carson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Meaker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael M. Mihm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01024

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Mihm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Carson

Canton, IL 61520

Defendants

Dr. Meaker

Dr. Osmundson

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Timothy Carson. Responses due by 2/6/2018 (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Timothy Carson.(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

2 #1

Notice regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 2/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice regarding Privacy Issues)(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timothy Carson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Timothy Carson. Responses due by 2/6/2018 (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Timothy Carson. (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Timothy Carson.(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Peoria Division,100 NE Monroe Street,Peoria,IL 61602. Merit Review Deadline set for 2/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice regarding Privacy Issues)(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timothy Carson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JS, ilcd) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Osmundson is a litigant