This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:15:04 (UTC).

Tracey Yvette Carrington v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Tracey Yvette Carrington filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Nancy A Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-01590

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tracey Yvette Carringotn

Tracey Yvette Carrington

Defendants

Commissioner Social Security

Nancy A. Berryhill

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Young Chul Cho

Attorney at Law Offices of Lawrence D Rohlfing

12631 East Imperial Highway Suite C115

Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670

Defendant Attorneys

In Seon Jeong

Attorney at SAUSA - Social Security Administration

160 Spear Street Suite 800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA

Attorney at Office of the General Counsel for Social Security Adm.

Assistant US Attorney LA-CV

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#13

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (dv) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). ; granting #7 REQUEST to Amend/Correct REQUEST to Amended Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #7 , REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . (dv) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (dv) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • (#15) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV18-1590 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney In Seon Jeong added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Jeong, In) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Cho, Young) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tracey Yvette Carrington, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 8/16/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cho, Young) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (dv) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (dv) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (dv) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). ; granting #7 REQUEST to Amend/Correct REQUEST to Amended Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #7 , REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . (dv) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REQUEST to Amended Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Tracey Yvette Carrington. (Cho, Young) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (lh) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tracey Yvette Carringotn, (Cho, Young) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tracey Yvette Carringotn. (Cho, Young) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Tracey Yvette Carringotn. (Cho, Young) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tracey Yvette Carringotn. (Cho, Young) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Tracey Yvette Carringotn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Young Chul Cho added to party Tracey Yvette Carringotn(pty:pla))(Cho, Young) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.