This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2018 at 07:59:24 (UTC).

Carman v. County of Collin, Texas et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2018 Carman filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Collin, Texas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine A. Nowak and Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00717

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine A. Nowak

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Carman

Ivanhoe, TX 75447

Defendants

Stephen Howell

Cie Gardez

Kalyn Rosser

Kristina Patterson

Megan Rachel

Veronica Gardez

Trista Thomas

Department of Family and Protective Services Collin County Unit

County of Collin, Texas

Plano Independent School District

Chris Jones

City of Plano

Plano Police Department

Emily Reichert

Steven Banh

John Roach, Jr.

Alyson Deitrich

Does 1-50 Inclusive

Lacey Mills

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Jacob Davis

Attorney at Matthews Shiels Knott Eden Davis & Beanland LLP - Dallas

8131 Lbj Freeway, Suite 700

Dallas, TX 75251

John Joseph Mongogna

Attorney at Albin Roach, PLLC - Frisco

5665 Dallas Parkway, Suite 200

Frisco, TX 75034

Charles Joseph Crawford

Attorney at Abernathy Roeder Boyd & Hullett, PC

1700 Redbud Blvd., Suite 300

Mckinney, TX 75069

Scot Macdonald Graydon

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Administrative Law Division

P O Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Frank A King

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General - Administrative Law Division

P O Box 12548, Capitol Station

Austin, TX 78711-2548

Other Attorneys

John Garrett Browning

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Dallas

2100 Ross Ave., Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#32

#31

30 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#30

29 #2

Text of Proposed Order

29 #1

Exhibit

#29

28 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#28

1 #36

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #35

Exhibit 33

1 #34

Exhibit 32

1 #33

Exhibit 31

1 #32

Exhibit 30

1 #11

Exhibit 9

1 #10

Exhibit 8

1 #9

Exhibit 7

1 #8

Exhibit 6

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Scot Macdonald Graydon on behalf of Deborah Pendergrass, John Roach, Jr. (Graydon, Scot) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ***DISREGARD ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED TO DOCKET ENTRY #30 *** Additional Attachments to Main Document: #30 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6).. (Mongogna, John) Modified on 11/21/2018 (kls, ). (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Megan Rachel. (Mongogna, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2018: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b)(6) by Alma Benavides. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Browning, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2018: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by Deborah Pendergrass. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Frank) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Plano Independent School District's Rule 12(6)(b) Motion to Dismiss by Plano Independent School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Exparete Temporary Orders, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Appointment of Court Appointed Special Advocates, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Subpoena Duces Tecum, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Order Extending Ex Parete Order, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Appointment of Attorney Ad Litem, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Order Extending Ex Parete Order- 6-15-15, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Order Extending Ex Parte Order - 6-29-15, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Mother's Affidavit for Relinquishing Parenting Rights, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Temporary Order, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - Permanency Hearing Order, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M - First Amended Original Petition for Protection of the Child, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N - Final Order in Suit Affecting Parent-Children Relationship, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O - Motion to Dismiss, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P - Order of Dismissal, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q - Student Records, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R- Relations with Governmental Entities, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S - State and Local Governmental Authorities Juvenile, #20 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Crawford, Charles) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss by Steven Banh, City of Plano, County of Collin, Texas, Alyson Deitrich, Stephen Howell, Chris Jones, Emily Reichert. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert) (Entered: 11/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION to Dismiss by Steven Banh, City of Plano, Stephen Howell, Chris Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Register of Actions, #2 Exhibit Order of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Relinquishment, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION to Dismiss by County of Collin, Texas, Alyson Deitrich, Emily Reichert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Register of Actions, #2 Exhibit Order of Dismissal, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Relinquishment, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by John Roach, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Frank) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Issued as to Kristina Patterson. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to Stephen Howell. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Steven Banh. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Plano Independent School District. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Chris Jones. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Megan Rachel. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. ***Consent form hand-delivered to plaintiff in clerk's office. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Amy Carman. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Part 1 of 2 of Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Amy Carman. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2 of Complaint, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Plano Police Department is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAMILY AND PROTECTIVE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Plano Independent School District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John G Browning