This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:39:20 (UTC).

Carlson, James v. State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Carlson, James filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen L. Crocker and Barbara B. Crabb. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00662

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

Presiding Judge

Barbara B. Crabb

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Michael Carlson

Defendants

James Morton

Amber Passno

State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources

Benjamin Benninghoff

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sara J. Geenen

Attorney at The Previant Law Firm, S.C.

1555 N. Rivercenter Drive, S. 202, P.O. Box 12993

Milwaukee, WI 53212

Joseph Michael Sexauer

Attorney at The Previant Law Firm, S.C.

310 W. Wisconsin Avenue, Ste. 100Mw

Milwaukee, WI 53203

Defendant Attorneys

Gesina S. Carson

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Shannon Ashley Conlin

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 West Main Street, Room 672

Madison, WI 53703

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Proposed Discovery Plan. (Geenen, Sara) Modified on 9/25/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#8

(#8) Disregard. See #9 . Modified on 9/26/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. (Carson, Gesina) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Shannon Ashley Conlin for Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. (Conlin, Shannon) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#5

(#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Gesina S. Carson for Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. (Carson, Gesina) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Geenen, Sara) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. (voc) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

2 #2

Exhibit B - EEOC letter/Reasonable Cause Determination dated 1/26/2018

2 #1

Exhibit A - EEOC Charge filed 6/2016

2 #4

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

2 #3

Exhibit C - DOJ letter to Carlson dated 5/11/18, postmarked 5/14/18, issuing Rig

2 #5

Summons

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2296427.), filed by James Michael Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge filed 6/2016, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC letter/Reasonable Cause Determination dated 1/26/2018, #3 Exhibit C - DOJ letter to Carlson dated 5/11/18, postmarked 5/14/18, issuing Right to Sue, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Geenen, Sara) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#1

(#1) Disregard. Modified on 8/10/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit A

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Proposed Discovery Plan. (Geenen, Sara) Modified on 9/25/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disregard. See #9 . Modified on 9/26/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2018 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER by Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. (Carson, Gesina) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Appearance filed by Shannon Ashley Conlin for Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. (Conlin, Shannon) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Notice of Appearance filed by Gesina S. Carson for Defendant State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. (Carson, Gesina) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Geenen, Sara) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. (voc) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge Barbara B. Crabb required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (voc) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge Barbara B. Crabb and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against State of Wisconsin Department of Natural Resources. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2296427.), filed by James Michael Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge filed 6/2016, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC letter/Reasonable Cause Determination dated 1/26/2018, #3 Exhibit C - DOJ letter to Carlson dated 5/11/18, postmarked 5/14/18, issuing Right to Sue, #4 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Geenen, Sara) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Disregard. Modified on 8/10/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.