This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 15:19:04 (UTC).

Cardinal Health 110, LLC v. Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC and Christopher Meyer

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 Cardinal Health 110, LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC and Christopher Meyer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael R. Barrett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael R. Barrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cardinal Health 110, LLC

7000 Cardinal Place

Dublin, OH 43017

Defendants

Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC and Christopher Meyer

Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC

Christopher Michael Meyer

Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC doing business as Courtland Discout Pharmacy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victoria E. Beckman

Attorney at Kegler Brown Hill + Ritter

65 E. State Street, Suite 1800

Columbus, OH 43215

Christy A Prince

Attorney at Kegler Brown Hill & Ritter

65 E State Street, Suit 1800

Columbus, OH 43215

Defendant Attorney

Andrew C Stebbins

55 Public Square, Suite 800

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER : This case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/27/2018. (jlw) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Defendant Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC (Stebbins, Andrew) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#2

(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC, Christopher Michael Meyer, filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC.Filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on August 8, 2018 as case number 18-cv-06770. (jlw) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 18CV006770 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6614789), filed by Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC and Christopher Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stebbins, Andrew) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketIntra District Transfer - Case transferred to Columbus as case number 2:18-cv-1131. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 2:18-cv-1131. (jlw) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER : This case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 9/27/2018. (jlw) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Defendant Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC (Stebbins, Andrew) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC, Christopher Michael Meyer, filed by Cardinal Health 110, LLC.Filed in Franklin County Court of Common Pleas on August 8, 2018 as case number 18-cv-06770. (jlw) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Common Pleas Court, case number 18CV006770 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6614789), filed by Allied Pharmacy Partners, LLC and Christopher Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Stebbins, Andrew) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cardinal Health Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew C Stebbins