This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2018 at 06:13:46 (UTC).

Canopius Capital Two Limited et al v. Jeanne Estates Apartments, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2016 Canopius Capital Two Limited filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Jeanne Estates Apartments, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:16-CV-04032

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

American Modern Select Insurance Company

American Western Home Insurance

Atrium 5 Limited

Canopius Capital Two Limited

Canopius US Insurance, Inc.

Defendants

Vanessa Griffin

Alexis Broderick

Alfonso Reid

Jeanne Estates Apartments, Inc.

Steve Johnson

Angela Ondrisek

Brooklynn Howard

Don Wolf

Shaina Broderick

Nicholas Broderick

Alsandra Reid

Twenty-First Century Holiness Tabernacle Church, Inc.

Marissa Broderick

Nathan Griffin

Matthew Broderick

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul L. Fields, Jr.

Darby Vincent Doan(Designation Retained)

Ann T. Kirk

Gregory L. Mast

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to File Affidavits in Support of Default and/or Move for Default Judgment within fifteen (15) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 11, 2017. (mll)

#44

(#44) ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. Parties settled, case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 30, 2017. (mll)

#34

(#34) ORDER granting 33 Motion to Bifurcate Discovery. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 20, 2017. (mll)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to File Affidavits in Support of Default and/or Move for Default Judgment within fifteen (15) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on September 11, 2017. (mll)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. Parties settled, case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to terms of settlement agreement. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on August 30, 2017. (mll)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) ORDER granting 33 Motion to Bifurcate Discovery. (See Order for specifics.) Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on March 20, 2017. (mll)

    Read MoreRead Less