This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 07:36:24 (UTC).

Campbell v. Taylor et al (INMATE 1)

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 Campbell filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Taylor INMATE 1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Emily C. Marks and Susan Russ Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00876

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emily C. Marks

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jarvis Marcel Campbell

Phenix City, AL 36868

Defendants

Steve Johnson

Sgt Schoceder

Heath Taylor

Ch. Alexander

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Landon Michael Eley

Attorney at Webb & Eley, P.C.

7475 Halcyon Pointe Drive

Montgomery, AL 36117

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDERED that on or before January 10, 2019 the plaintiff shall file a response to the defendants' written reports, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/6/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

12 #1

Exhibit K

#11

(#11) ORDERED that on or before December 18, 2018 the defendants shall file a supplement to this report which identifies the type of sandwiches provided to inmates for lunch and describes the meals served to inmates for breakfast and dinner during a typical week. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/28/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#12

(#12) Response to Order re #11 Order, by Ch. Alexander, Steve Johnson, Sgt Schoceder, Heath Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K)(Eley, Landon) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#10

(#10) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Heath Taylor. (Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sgt Schoceder. (Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#8

(#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steve Johnson. (Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#7

(#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ch. Alexander. (Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#6

(#6) Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Ch. Alexander, Steve Johnson, Sgt Schoceder, Heath Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

6 #4

Exhibit D

6 #8

Exhibit H

6 #9

Exhibit I

6 #6

Exhibit F

6 #7

Exhibit G

6 #1

Exhibit A

6 #3

Exhibit C

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #5

Exhibit E

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDERED that on or before January 10, 2019 the plaintiff shall file a response to the defendants' written reports, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 12/6/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Response to Order re #11 Order, by Ch. Alexander, Steve Johnson, Sgt Schoceder, Heath Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K)(Eley, Landon) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Ch. Alexander, Steve Johnson, Sgt Schoceder, Heath Taylor (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, ) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDERED that on or before December 18, 2018 the defendants shall file a supplement to this report which identifies the type of sandwiches provided to inmates for lunch and describes the meals served to inmates for breakfast and dinner during a typical week. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 11/28/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Heath Taylor. (Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sgt Schoceder. (Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steve Johnson. (Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ch. Alexander. (Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Special Report to Inmate 1983 Complaint by Ch. Alexander, Steve Johnson, Sgt Schoceder, Heath Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Eley, Landon) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Partial Filing fee received: $ 5.28, receipt number 4602051081 (kh, ) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before November 28, 2018; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/12/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Russell County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 10/12/2018. (kh, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jarvis Marcel Campbell. (beh, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Ch. Alexander, Steve Johnson, Sgt Schoceder, Heath Taylor, filed by Jarvis Marcel Campbell.(beh, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.