This case was last updated from PACER on 10/08/2018 at 07:27:24 (UTC).

Campbell v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Campbell filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and Laurie J. Michelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-12478

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Presiding Judge

Laurie J. Michelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darreis Campbell

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

First Federal Credit Control, Inc.

M&T Bank Corporation

Exeter Finance Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary D. Nitzkin

Attorney at Nitzkin Assoc.

22142 W. Nine Mile Road

Southfield, MI 48033

Carl Schwartz

Attorney at Michigan Consumer Credit Lawyers

22142 West Nine Mile Road

Southfield, MI 48033

Defendant Attorneys

Jordan S. Bolton

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

151 S. Old Woodward Ave., Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

Misty L. Peterson

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Altanta, GA 30309

Tameika Lavenia Montgomery

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309

Boyd W. Gentry

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF BOYD W. GENTRY, LLC

4031 Colonel Glenn Highway

Beavercreek, OH 45431

Jeffrey D. Pilgrim

Attorney at Pilgrim Christakis LLP

321 North Clark Street, 26Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Stephen W. King

Attorney at King & Murray PLLC

355 S. Old Woodward Avenue, Suite 100

Birmingham, MI 48009

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) Case Management Requirements and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/17/2018, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/31/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (TMcg) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Schwartz on behalf of Darreis Campbell. (Schwartz, Carl) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#16

(#16) ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant First Federal Credit Control, Inc. re #15 Stipulation filed by First Federal Credit Control, Inc.., First Federal Credit Control, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

#15

(#15) STIPULATION Of Dismissal of First Federal Credit Control by First Federal Credit Control, Inc. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

#14

(#14) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Nitzkin, Gary) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darreis Campbell as to Exeter Finance Corp. (Nitzkin, Gary) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Exeter Finance Corp.., ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson). Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darreis Campbell as to M&T Bank Corporation (Nitzkin, Gary) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by First Federal Credit Control, Inc.. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Misty L. Peterson on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Peterson, Misty) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tameika Lavenia Montgomery on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, Tameika) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#6

(#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of Exeter Finance Corp.. (King, Stephen) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Exeter Finance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Enzo Parent, LLC for Exeter Finance Corp.. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Pilgrim on behalf of Exeter Finance Corp.. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#12) ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Exeter Finance Corp.., ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson). Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Case Management Requirements and SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/17/2018, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/31/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson and Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 at 8:30 AM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (Refer to image for additional dates) (TMcg) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson: Scheduling Conference held on 9/13/2018 (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (TMcg) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Schwartz on behalf of Darreis Campbell. (Schwartz, Carl) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER of Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant First Federal Credit Control, Inc. re #15 Stipulation filed by First Federal Credit Control, Inc.., First Federal Credit Control, Inc. terminated. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION Of Dismissal of First Federal Credit Control by First Federal Credit Control, Inc. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Nitzkin, Gary) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darreis Campbell as to Exeter Finance Corp. (Nitzkin, Gary) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER to Attend Scheduling Conference and Notice of Requirements for Submission of Discovery Plan re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Exeter Finance Corp.., ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2018 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Laurie J. Michelson). Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Darreis Campbell as to M&T Bank Corporation (Nitzkin, Gary) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by First Federal Credit Control, Inc.. (Gentry, Boyd) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Defendant Exeter Finance LLC's Extension to Respond to Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal, ( Response due by 8/30/2018). Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (TMcg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Misty L. Peterson on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Peterson, Misty) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tameika Lavenia Montgomery on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Montgomery, Tameika) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Bolton, Jordan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. King on behalf of Exeter Finance Corp.. (King, Stephen) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SKra) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Exeter Finance Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Enzo Parent, LLC for Exeter Finance Corp.. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Pilgrim on behalf of Exeter Finance Corp.. (Pilgrim, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Exeter Finance Corp. from Third Judicial Circuit Court of Wayne County, case number 18-005412-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-6854210 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pilgrim, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less