This case was last updated from PACER on 02/01/2019 at 08:05:09 (UTC).

CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY was filed as a Personal Injury - Marine lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cathy Bissoon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01609

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Bissoon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC

Counter Claimant and Claimant

ANTHONY MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Marjorie Bagnato

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

2 Ppg Place, 4Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Dennis A Watson

Attorney at Dickie McCamey & Chilcote

2 Ppg Place, #400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Counter Claimant and Claimant Attorneys

Steven C. Schletker

Attorney at Steven C. Schletker, Attorney at Law

50 E. Rivercenter Blvd., Suite 220

Covington, KY 41011

Stephen P. Moschetta

Attorney at The Moschetta Law Firm, P.C.

28 West Cherry Avenue

Washington, PA 15301

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Schletker on behalf of ANTHONY MARTIN. (Schletker, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

12 #2

Proposed Order

12 #1

Affidavit

#12

(#12) MOTION for attorney Steven C. Schletker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5002609) by Anthony Martin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Moschetta, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC by Anthony Martin. (Moschetta, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Moschetta on behalf of Anthony Martin. (Moschetta, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

#9

(#9) REISSUE OF NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY PER 8 ORDER ON MOTION (jd) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION to Extend Time to February 15, 2019 by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY re #5 Order on Motion (jd) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #4 ) for Approval of the Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking, for an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice, and for Issuance of an Injunction is GRANTED. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/14/18. (rdl) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

4 #2

Proposed Order

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4951807), filed by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (jd) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Schletker on behalf of ANTHONY MARTIN. (Schletker, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Steven Schletker, Esq., to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Anthony Martin. The Court no longer utilizes a "sponsorship" model for pro hac vice admission. In the future, counsel must comply with the provision in Local Rule 83.2.B stating, "[a] motion for admission pro hac vice must be made[, i.e., filed,] by the attorney seeking to be admitted" (in this case, Steven Schletker). Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/23/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for attorney Steven C. Schletker to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5002609) by Anthony Martin. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Moschetta, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC by Anthony Martin. (Moschetta, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Moschetta on behalf of Anthony Martin. (Moschetta, Stephen) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REISSUE OF NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY PER 8 ORDER ON MOTION (jd) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #7 ) to Extend Time to Publish Notice of Filing Complaint for Exoneration or Limitation of Liability and Reissuance of Notice is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall, forthwith, reissue the Notice out of and under seal of this Court reflecting the date of February 15, 2019 as the date fixed for filing of claims. Counsel for Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. shall cause the Notice to be published in the Pittsburgh Post-Gazette once each week for four (4) consecutive weeks prior to February 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/8/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rdl) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Extend Time to February 15, 2019 by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF FILING OF COMPLAINT FOR EXONERATION OR LIMITATION OF LIABILITY re #5 Order on Motion (jd) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion (Doc. #4 ) for Approval of the Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking, for an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice, and for Issuance of an Injunction is GRANTED. See contents of this filing. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/14/18. (rdl) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for (1) Approval of Ad Interim Stipulation for Value and Letter of Undertaking; (2) an Order Directing Issuance of the Required Notice; and (3) Issuance of an Injunction by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Bagnato, Marjorie) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Watson, Dennis) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-4951807), filed by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (jd) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less