This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2018 at 07:54:41 (UTC).

Calltrol Corporation v. LoxySoft AB et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2018 Calltrol Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against LoxySoft AB. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelson Stephen Roman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:18-CV-09026

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelson Stephen Roman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calltrol Corporation

Defendants

LoxySoft Inc.

LoxySoft AB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jean-Marc Zimmerman

Attorney at Zimmerman, Levi & Korsinsky, LLP (NJ)

226 St. Paul Street

Westfield, NJ 07090

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit Reseller Agreement

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15649655)Document filed by Calltrol Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit Schedule A)(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 10/3/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Calltrol Corporation.(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit Schedule A

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LoxySoft AB and LoxySoft Inc., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Calltrol Corporation. (Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit Schedule A

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LoxySoft AB and LoxySoft Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Calltrol Corporation. (Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 10/3/2018 (dnh). Modified on 10/18/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LoxySoft AB, LoxySoft Inc.. (dnh) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

#5

(#5) COMPLAINT against LoxySoft AB, LoxySoft Inc.. Document filed by Calltrol Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit Schedule A)(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) (Entered: 10/06/2018)

5 #1

Exhibit Reseller Agreement

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to LoxySoft AB, LoxySoft Inc.. (dnh) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LoxySoft AB and LoxySoft Inc., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Calltrol Corporation. (Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT against LoxySoft AB, LoxySoft Inc.. Document filed by Calltrol Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit Schedule A)(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) (Entered: 10/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the summons is not the correct A.O. Summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 120 FORM PATENT/TRADEMARK. Notice to Attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman to submit a completed AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark to court for review. Use the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code left blank. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:1125 (a). (dnh) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jean-Marc Zimmerman to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Do not use the all defendants radio button, each defendant must be selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LoxySoft AB and LoxySoft Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Calltrol Corporation. (Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 10/3/2018 (dnh). Modified on 10/18/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Calltrol Corporation.(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15649655)Document filed by Calltrol Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit Schedule A)(Zimmerman, Jean-Marc) Modified on 10/3/2018 (dnh). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.