This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:32:57 (UTC).

California Self-Insureds Security Fund et al v. Siegel

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 California Self-Insureds Security Fund filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Siegel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is M. Hannah Lauck. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00619

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Hannah Lauck

 

Party Details

Appellants

Andre Schoorl

California Self-Insureds Security Fund

Defendant

Alfred Siegel

Interested Party

USBC-Richmond (United States Bankruptcy Court)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Louis J Cisz, III

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

One Embarcadero Center, 18Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

William Edward Evans

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP (DC)

799 9Th Street Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20001-4501

Defendant Attorneys

Lynn Lewis Tavenner

Attorney at Tavenner & Beran PLC

20 N Eighth St, 2Nd Fl

Richmond, VA 23219

Andrew Caine

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., 13Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven T. Gubner

Attorney at Brutzkus Gubner

21650 Oxnard St, Suite 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Self-Insureds Security Fund. (Evans, William) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#16

(#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfred Siegel. (Tavenner, Lynn) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#15

(#15) Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement (Appellee Liquidating Trustee's Reply of No Opposition to Appellant California Self-Insureds' Security Funds Motion to File Under Seal September 18, 2016 Settlement Agreement) filed by Alfred Siegel (Tavenner, Lynn). Modified to correct filing event on 10/24/2018 (sbea, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#14

RESTRICTED

13 #4

Designation of Record - 4

13 #3

Designation of Record - 3

13 #2

Designation of Record - 2

13 #1

Designation of Record - 1

#13

(#13) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record - 1, #2 Designation of Record - 2, #3 Designation of Record - 3, #4 Designation of Record - 4). (sbea, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#12

(#12) Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement filed by California Self-Insureds Security Fund. (Evans, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by California Self-Insureds Security Fund re #9 MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement (Evans, William) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

9 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal

#9

(#9) MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement by California Self-Insureds Security Fund. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal)(Evans, William) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Andrew William Caine to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Alfred Siegel. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/10/2018. (sbea, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Steven T. Gubner for Alfred Siegel. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/09/2018. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#6

(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven T. Gubner and Certification of Local Counsel Lynn Lewis Tavenner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6303825. by Alfred Siegel. (Tavenner, Lynn) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#5

(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew William Caine and Certification of Local Counsel Lynn Lewis Tavenner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6303777. by Alfred Siegel. (Tavenner, Lynn) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by California Self-Insureds Security Fund. (Evans, William) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfred Siegel. (Tavenner, Lynn) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Response to Motion re: #9 MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement (Appellee Liquidating Trustee's Reply of No Opposition to Appellant California Self-Insureds' Security Funds Motion to File Under Seal September 18, 2016 Settlement Agreement) filed by Alfred Siegel (Tavenner, Lynn). Modified to correct filing event on 10/24/2018 (sbea, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Sealed Document: Restricted Transcript of July 25, 2018 - Transcript of Hearing proceedings from U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (sbea, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record - 1, #2 Designation of Record - 2, #3 Designation of Record - 3, #4 Designation of Record - 4). (sbea, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement filed by California Self-Insureds Security Fund. (Evans, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Sealed Document re #9 MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement. (Evans, William) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re: #9 MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement; Clerk notified filing attorney of proper filing procedures for the "Memorandum in Support". The attorney was requested to re-file the "Memorandum in Support" as a separate document and link it back to the motion. Clerk also directed attorney to Chapter 8 of E-Filing Procedures for submitting "Sealed" documents. (sbea, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by California Self-Insureds Security Fund re #9 MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement (Evans, William) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Seal September 19, 2016 Settlement Agreement by California Self-Insureds Security Fund. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal)(Evans, William) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Andrew William Caine to appear as Pro Hac Vice for Alfred Siegel. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/10/2018. (sbea, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed Steven T. Gubner for Alfred Siegel. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 10/09/2018. (tjoh, ) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven T. Gubner and Certification of Local Counsel Lynn Lewis Tavenner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6303825. by Alfred Siegel. (Tavenner, Lynn) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew William Caine and Certification of Local Counsel Lynn Lewis Tavenner Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6303777. by Alfred Siegel. (Tavenner, Lynn) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Louis J. Cisz, III to appear as Pro Hac Vice for California Self Insureds Security Fund. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 9/26/2018. (sbea, ) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Louis J. Cisz, III and Certification of Local Counsel William E. Evans Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6286544. by California Self-Insureds Security Fund. (Evans, William). Clerk corrected case number and case name and replaced the document on 9/26/2018). Modified docket text on 9/26/2018 (sbea, ). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter from Clerk re: Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Rule 8018. Clerk also mailed a copy to named attorneys. (Attachment: #1 FRBP Rule 8018). (sbea, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court. Bankruptcy Case Number: 18-3040-KRH filed by California Self-Insureds Security Fund. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Amended Notice of Appeal). (sbea, ) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.