This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2018 at 07:44:20 (UTC).

Calhoun et al v. United States

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 Calhoun filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall, G. R. Smith and James E. Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judges

G. R. Smith

James E. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vidalia Fish House

Carolyn Calhoun

Defendant

United States

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tina Euginia Maddox

Attorney at Cliett & Hart, LLC

23 Ne Broad St.

Metter, GA 30439

Defendant Attorneys

Otto Woelke Leithart

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Savannah

P.O. Box 8970, 22 Barnard Street, Suite 300

Savannah, GA 31401

Shannon Heath Statkus

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - AUG

P O Box 2017

Augusta, GA 30901

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#15

(#15) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House for dates of : November 21, 2018; November 23, 2018, December 21, 2018, December 24, 2018, December 26, 2018 through December 28, 2018; December 31, 2018; February 13, 2019 through February 15, 2019; April 1, 2019 through April 5, 2019; May 31, 2019, June 3, 2019 through June 7,2019, June 10, 2019 through June 11,2019, July 5, 2019; July 22, 2019 through July 26, 2019 by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House. Responses due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #4 and #6 Motions to Stay and staying Plaintiffs' SNAP program participation until such time as this civil action is concluded. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/16/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leithart, Otto) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of United States (Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

Motions No Longer Referred: #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification, #6 MOTION to Stay. (trb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#4

Motions No Longer Referred: #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification, #6 MOTION to Stay. (trb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#2

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House re #3 Order, #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House re #3 Order, #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave of Absence. The attorney must make arrangements for other counsel to appear in the event the case is scheduled for hearing or trial during such leave. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/20/18. (sff) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House for dates of : November 21, 2018; November 23, 2018, December 21, 2018, December 24, 2018, December 26, 2018 through December 28, 2018; December 31, 2018; February 13, 2019 through February 15, 2019; April 1, 2019 through April 5, 2019; May 31, 2019, June 3, 2019 through June 7,2019, June 10, 2019 through June 11,2019, July 5, 2019; July 22, 2019 through July 26, 2019 by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House. Responses due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #4 and #6 Motions to Stay and staying Plaintiffs' SNAP program participation until such time as this civil action is concluded. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/16/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification filed by United States. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leithart, Otto) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of United States (Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of United States (Leithart, Otto) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Setting Hearing on #4 and #6 MOTIONS to Stay Disqualification: Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2018 02:00 PM in Statesboro - 1st Floor Courtroom before Chief Judge J. Randal Hall. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 11/14/2018. (jlh) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: United States (Shanta Swezy and Sonny Perdue) answer due 11/30/2018. (trb) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits and Certificate of Service; Amended Certificate of Service; General Order; Motion to Stay Disqualification; Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to stay; Order Staying Administrative Action; and Litigants Bill of Rights served on Shanta Swezy; Sonny Perdue on 10/01/2018, filed by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions No Longer Referred: #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification, #6 MOTION to Stay. (trb) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification, #6 MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification. (trb) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House. (Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House re #3 Order, #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint (Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House. Responses due by 10/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Stay Disqualification filed by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House. (Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Stay Disqualification by Carolyn Calhoun, Vidalia Fish House. Responses due by 10/12/2018. (Maddox, Tina) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 09/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (evs) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to United States (Shanta Swezy and Sonny Perdue). (evs) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2454816. (evs) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against United States, filed by Carolyn Calhoun and Vidalia Fish House. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(evs) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less