This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/02/2019 at 07:09:45 (UTC).

Cabrera v. Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 Cabrera filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Paul Oetken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-11269

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Paul Oetken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luisa Cabrera

Defendants

Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC

Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.

618 Ninth Avenue, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Brandon Satisky

Attorney at Satisky Law, PLLC

34 Russell Street, Ste #3

Brooklyn, NY 11222

Defendant Attorney

Justin Thomas Nastro

Attorney at Freehill, Hogan & Mahar, LLP

80 Pine Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER: On December 17, 2018, the Parties to the above-referred action filed a Stipulation to Remand Removed Action. The Court having reviewed that Stipulation and good cause appearing, Orders as follows: The Parties' stipulation is approved. United States District Court for the Southern District of New York Case No.: 1:18-cv-11269-JPO, styled Cabrera v. Chiplote Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC is hereby remanded to Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New YorK. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/17/2018) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Brandon Satisky on behalf of Luisa Cabrera. (Satisky, David) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on December 4, 2018 by Defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC and Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Removing Defendants). Counsel for the Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant 618 Ninth Avenue, LLC, are directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than December 19, 2018. The Removing Defendants shall, on or before December 21, 2018, either (1) show cause as to why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, or (2) move to file an amended Notice of Removal that properly pleads jurisdiction. Counsel for the Removing Defendants shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant 618 Ninth Avenue, LLC by December 14, 2018, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Service due by 12/14/2018, Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2018.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/7/2018) (jca) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. for Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit "A" Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155887/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15998488).Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Summons and Complaint)(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1Z E22 E53 23 1001 629 5 on 12/19/2018. (ama) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: On December 17, 2018, the Parties to the above-referred action filed a Stipulation to Remand Removed Action. The Court having reviewed that Stipulation and good cause appearing, Orders as follows: The Parties' stipulation is approved. United States District Court for the Southern District of New York Case No.: 1:18-cv-11269-JPO, styled Cabrera v. Chiplote Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC is hereby remanded to Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New YorK. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/17/2018) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.. (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Brandon Satisky on behalf of Luisa Cabrera. (Satisky, David) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: This case was removed from New York Supreme Court, New York County, on December 4, 2018 by Defendants Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC and Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. (Removing Defendants). Counsel for the Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant 618 Ninth Avenue, LLC, are directed to file an appearance with this Court no later than December 19, 2018. The Removing Defendants shall, on or before December 21, 2018, either (1) show cause as to why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, or (2) move to file an amended Notice of Removal that properly pleads jurisdiction. Counsel for the Removing Defendants shall serve a copy of this order on counsel for the Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant 618 Ninth Avenue, LLC by December 14, 2018, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Service due by 12/14/2018, Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2018.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/7/2018) (jca) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (vf) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. for Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC. Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc..(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 155887/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-15998488).Document filed by Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc., Chipotle Mexican Grill of Colorado, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Summons and Complaint)(Nastro, Justin) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less