This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2018 at 07:50:13 (UTC).

Cabela's LLC v. Highby et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Cabela's LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Highby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01223

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cabela's LLC

Defendants

Molly Highby

Matthew Highby

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin Michael Coen

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

David John Teklits

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Alexandra M. Cumings

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

Defendant Attorneys

Karen Riesenburger Poppel

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

Andrew John Koopman

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jeffrey B. Bove

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

Rex A. Donnelly, IV

Attorney at RatnerPrestia, P.C.

1007 Orange Street, Suite 205, P.O. Box 1596

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

18 #1

Certificate of Service

#18

#17

#16

5 #2

Certificate of Service

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

3 #4

Certificate of Service

3 #3

Exhibit 3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REQUEST for Oral Argument by Cabela's LLC re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Based On Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, to Transfer This Case to The United States District Court For The District Of Nebraska. (Coen, Kevin) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews, from Kevin M. Coen regarding request to schedule argument on Motion to Dismiss. (Coen, Kevin) Modified on 9/10/2018 (nms). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Based On Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, to Transfer This Case to The United States District Court For The District Of Nebraska filed by Matthew Highby, Molly Highby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bove, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant To F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), by Cabela's LLC. (Cumings, Alexandra) Modified on 9/4/2018 (nms). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Cumings on behalf of Cabela's LLC (Cumings, Alexandra) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Based On Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, to Transfer This Case to The United States District Court For The District Of Nebraska filed by Cabela's LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Coen, Kevin) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATEMENT of Pending Matters Which Require Judicial Action Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, by Matthew Highby, Molly Highby, Highby Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bove, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/31/2018 (nms). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER: The Motion to Expedite (D.I. #9 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/27/2018. (nms) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Cabela's LLC. (Coen, Kevin) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The brief filed at D.I. 10 has been removed from the docket as the incorrect filing event code was used. The "Opening Brief" or "Memorandum in Support" filing event code should be used when filing a brief accompanying a motion. Counsel shall refile the brief accordingly. (nms) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Molly M. Highby re #6 Opening Brief in Support, by Matthew Highby, Molly Highby, Highby Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bove, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/20/2018 (nms). (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Matthew D. Highby re #6 Opening Brief in Support, by Matthew Highby, Molly Highby, Highby Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bove, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/20/2018 (nms). Modified on 8/20/2018 (nms). (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) OPENING BRIEF in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Based On Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, to Transfer This Case to The United States District Court For The District Of Nebraska, filed by Matthew Highby, Molly Highby, Highby Outdoors, LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bove, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/20/2018 (nms). (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Based On Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, Or, In The Alternative, to Transfer This Case to The United States District Court For The District Of Nebraska - filed by Matthew Highby, Molly Highby, Highby Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bove, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/20/2018 (nms). (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: The briefing schedule established by the filing of D.I. 3 has been removed. The motion to expedite that the filing relates to is a motion pending before state court, and is not a filed motion with this Court. (nms) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Highby Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bove, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition to Motion to Expedite (filed in State Court D.I. 1-2), filed by Matthew Highby, Molly Highby, Highby Outdoors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bove, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/16/2018 (nms). (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (crb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL and copies of documents from DE Chancery Ct., Case Number 2018-572 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0311-2436988)- filed by Highby Outdoors, LLC, Molly Highby, Matthew Highby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(crb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CABELA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rex A. Donnelly, IV(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Karen R. Poppel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey B. Bove