This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:35:31 (UTC).

C. et al v. Manchester School District SAU 37

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 C filed an Other lawsuit against Manchester School District SAU 37. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00749

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

George C.

Susan C.

Defendant

Manchester School District SAU 37

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sheila O'Leary Zakre

Attorney at Zakre Law Office

4 Park St, Ste 206

Concord, NH 03301

Defendant Attorney

Melissa A. Hewey

Attorney at Drummond Woodsum

84 Marginal Way, Ste 600

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa A. Hewey on behalf of Manchester School District SAU 37 Attorney Melissa A. Hewey added to party Manchester School District SAU 37(pty:dft).(Hewey, Melissa) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

1 #3

Summons - Waiver Notice and waiver request

#1

(#1) NEW CASE/IDEA COMPLAINT Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1701166 filed by Susan C., George C. Administrative Record Due 9/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Zakre with invoice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Lawsuit)(Zakre, Sheila) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2018: #4 Waiver of Service) (mc). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#3

(#3) Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Manchester School District SAU 37. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

1 #1

Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Zakre with invoice

#2

(#2) Potential CONSOLIDATION Notice. Cases 1:18-cv-724-AJ and 1:18-cv-749-JD may be consolidated. Objections to Consolidation due 10/8/2018.(mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) CONSOLIDATION ORDER. 18-cv-724-AJ and 18-cv-749-JD are consolidated into one case. 18-cv-749-JD is statistically closed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Manchester School District SAU 37 by Susan C., George C.. Served/Mailed on 8/31/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/2/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Zakre, Sheila) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Issue is attorney's fee and costs to Plaintiff as prevail

3 #1

Notice ECF

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSOLIDATION ORDER. 18-cv-724-AJ and 18-cv-749-JD are consolidated into one case. 18-cv-749-JD is statistically closed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • (SEALED) IDEA Administrative Record. Certificate of Completion due: 10/22/2018.(ko) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Manchester School District SAU 37 by Susan C., George C.. Served/Mailed on 8/31/2018. Answer Follow Up on 11/2/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Zakre, Sheila) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa A. Hewey on behalf of Manchester School District SAU 37 Attorney Melissa A. Hewey added to party Manchester School District SAU 37(pty:dft).(Hewey, Melissa) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Manchester School District SAU 37. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Potential CONSOLIDATION Notice. Cases 1:18-cv-724-AJ and 1:18-cv-749-JD may be consolidated. Objections to Consolidation due 10/8/2018.(mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:18-cv-749-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/IDEA COMPLAINT Filing fee $400, receipt number 0102-1701166 filed by Susan C., George C. Administrative Record Due 9/24/2018. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Zakre with invoice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Lawsuit)(Zakre, Sheila) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2018: #4 Waiver of Service) (mc). (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.