This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2019 at 07:32:58 (UTC).

Byrd v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 Byrd filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-06120

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Byrd, Jr.

Defendant

Allstate Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth Jerald Mitchell

Attorney at Taylor King & Associates, P.A.

5209 John F. Kennedy Boulevard

North Little Rock, AR 72116

Defendant Attorney

Jason J. Campbell

Attorney at Anderson, Murphy & Hopkins, LLP

400 West Capitol Ave., Suite 2470

Little Rock, AR 72201

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Allstate Insurance Company. (Campbell, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#8

(#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted by 1/21/2019. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/15/2019. Jury Trial set for the week of 1/6/2020 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 7, 2018. (rwg) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Company. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATION by Allstate Insurance Company. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company.(mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allstate Insurance Company, filed by James Byrd, Jr. (Originally filed in Circuit Court of Garland County on 10/01/2018, case 26CV-18-1495).(mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Allstate Insurance Company. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C: Allstate's Answer

1 #2

Exhibit B: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Demand Letter

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, case number 26CV-18-1495., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit B: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Allstate's Answer)(mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Allstate Insurance Company. (Campbell, Jason) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to be conducted by 1/21/2019. JOINT Rule 26(f) Meeting Report due by 2/15/2019. Jury Trial set for the week of 1/6/2020 in Hot Springs -- 3rd flr (Rm 360) before Honorable Susan O. Hickey. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on December 7, 2018. (rwg) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Notice of Removal fee received: $400.00, receipt number 2020973. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Company. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATION by Allstate Insurance Company. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company.(mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allstate Insurance Company, filed by James Byrd, Jr. (Originally filed in Circuit Court of Garland County on 10/01/2018, case 26CV-18-1495).(mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 11/29/2018. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Allstate Insurance Company. (mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Garland County, case number 26CV-18-1495., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiff's Demand Letter, #2 Exhibit B: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Allstate's Answer)(mjm) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.