This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2018 at 07:20:04 (UTC).

Butler v. Mallinckrodt LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 Butler filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mallinckrodt LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Catherine D. Perry and Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01701

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Catherine D. Perry

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela Butler

Defendants

Cotter Corp.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonathan M. Soper

Attorney at HUMPHREY AND FARRINGTON

221 W. Lexington, Suite 400

Independence, MO 64050

Defendant Attorneys

Dale A. Guariglia

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Erin Lynn Brooks

Attorney at BRYAN CAVE LLP

One Metropolitan Square, 211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

David R. Erickson

Attorney at SHOOK AND HARDY, LLP

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Request for Rule 16 Pretrial Conference by Plaintiffs Anthony Hines, Pamela Butler, Kenneth Koterba, Emery David Walick, III. Associated Cases: 4:12-cv-00361-AGF, 4:18-cv-01701-AGF, 4:18-cv-01702-AGF, 4:18-cv-01703-AGF, 4:18-cv-01704-AGF(Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' joint motion to consolidate is GRANTED. ECF No. 743. The cases listed above are consolidated with Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF for pretrial purposes. The undersigned will preside over all pretrial motions on common issues, including ruling on any dispositive and Daubert motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case Management Orders and other Orders entered in the Lead Case shall apply to all consolidated cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall consolidate the cases listed above with Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF. At the conclusion of the pretrial phase, the cases will be unconsolidated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings other than pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, should be made in this case, Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF, which is designated as the "Lead Case," and should only reference the case number of the Lead Case. Pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) should be filed only in the individual (original) case file. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in the Lead Case and in each of the above-listed cases. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on November 13, 2018. (BRP) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#14

(#14) MEMORANDUM re #10 Notice (Other) in Opposition to Motion/Notice to Consolidate by Plaintiff Pamela Butler. (Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#13

(#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Dale A. Guariglia for Defendant Cotter Corp.. (Guariglia, Dale) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#12

(#12) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cotter Corp.. Parent companies: General Atomics Uranium Resources, LLC,. (Brooks, Erin) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#11

(#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Cotter Corp..(Brooks, Erin) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

10 #1

Exhibit Defendants' Motion for Pretrial Consolidation

#10

(#10) NOTICE Motion to Consolidate: by Defendant Cotter Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Motion for Pretrial Consolidation)(Brooks, Erin) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#9

(#9) DEFENDANT MALLINCKRODT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC.(Erickson, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC. Parent companies: Mallinckrodt, Subsidiaries: Mallinckrodt LLC, Publicly held company: Mallinckrodt plc,. (Erickson, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by David R. Erickson for Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC. (Erickson, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of attorney Jonathan M. Soper for admission pro hac vice #5 is granted for purposes of representing plaintiff Pamela Butler in this case. If attorney Soper chooses not to apply for admission to the bar of this Court, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future motions for admission pro hac vice filed in the United States District Court, Eastern District of Missouri, by attorney Jonathan M. Soper shall have this Order attached to the motion(s) as well as a statement from attorney Soper explaining why he believes he is not regularly engaged in the practice of law here. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/12/18. (EAB) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan M Soper. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6799827) by Plaintiff Pamela Butler. (Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Pamela Butler Process Server: HPS Process and Investigations (Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

3 #3

Summons Summons

3 #2

Summons Summons

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number 0865-6797427, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Pamela Jo Butler.(Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Leave to Request for Rule 16 Pretrial Conference by Plaintiffs Anthony Hines, Pamela Butler, Kenneth Koterba, Emery David Walick, III. Associated Cases: 4:12-cv-00361-AGF, 4:18-cv-01701-AGF, 4:18-cv-01702-AGF, 4:18-cv-01703-AGF, 4:18-cv-01704-AGF(Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' joint motion to consolidate is GRANTED. ECF No. 743. The cases listed above are consolidated with Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF for pretrial purposes. The undersigned will preside over all pretrial motions on common issues, including ruling on any dispositive and Daubert motions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case Management Orders and other Orders entered in the Lead Case shall apply to all consolidated cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall consolidate the cases listed above with Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF. At the conclusion of the pretrial phase, the cases will be unconsolidated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings other than pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, should be made in this case, Case No. 4:12-CV-00361-AGF, which is designated as the "Lead Case," and should only reference the case number of the Lead Case. Pleadings as defined in Rule 7(a) should be filed only in the individual (original) case file. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this Order in the Lead Case and in each of the above-listed cases. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on November 13, 2018. (BRP) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MEMORANDUM re #10 Notice (Other) in Opposition to Motion/Notice to Consolidate by Plaintiff Pamela Butler. (Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ENTRY of Appearance by Dale A. Guariglia for Defendant Cotter Corp.. (Guariglia, Dale) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Cotter Corp.. Parent companies: General Atomics Uranium Resources, LLC,. (Brooks, Erin) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Cotter Corp..(Brooks, Erin) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE Motion to Consolidate: by Defendant Cotter Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Motion for Pretrial Consolidation)(Brooks, Erin) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) DEFENDANT MALLINCKRODT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC.(Erickson, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC. Parent companies: Mallinckrodt, Subsidiaries: Mallinckrodt LLC, Publicly held company: Mallinckrodt plc,. (Erickson, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by David R. Erickson for Defendant Mallinckrodt LLC. (Erickson, David) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of attorney Jonathan M. Soper for admission pro hac vice #5 is granted for purposes of representing plaintiff Pamela Butler in this case. If attorney Soper chooses not to apply for admission to the bar of this Court, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future motions for admission pro hac vice filed in the United States District Court, Eastern District of Missouri, by attorney Jonathan M. Soper shall have this Order attached to the motion(s) as well as a statement from attorney Soper explaining why he believes he is not regularly engaged in the practice of law here. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/12/18. (EAB) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan M Soper. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6799827) by Plaintiff Pamela Butler. (Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Jonathan M. Soper. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Pamela Butler Process Server: HPS Process and Investigations (Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUPPLEMENTAL Filing Forms by Plaintiff Pamela Butler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons, #3 Summons Summons)(Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter to attorney Jonathan M. Soper from Clerk re: Pro Hac Vice (MFG) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number 0865-6797427, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Pamela Jo Butler.(Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cotter Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Mallinckrodt LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dale A. Guariglia