This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 10:44:53 (UTC).

Butler County Board of Commissioners v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Butler County Board of Commissioners filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804) and Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-OP-45037

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butler County Board of Commissioners

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

McKesson Corporation

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Richard Karon

700 W. St. Clair Avenue, Suite 200

Cleveland, OH 44113

Daniel R. Karon

Attorney at Law Office of Daniel R. Karon

700 St. Clair Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Sean P. McGinley

Attorney at DiPiero, Simmons, McGinley & Bastress

604 Virginia Street East

Charleston, WV 25301

Mark H. Troutman

Attorney at Gibbs Law

1111 Broadway

Oakland, CA 94607

Beau D. Hollowell

Attorney at Law Office of Daniel R. Karon

700 St. Clair Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44113

Gregory M. Travalio

Attorney at Isaac Wiles - Columbus

Two Miranova Place

Columbus, OH 43215

Shawn Kincade Judge

Attorney at Gibbs Law

1111 Broadway

Oakland, CA 94607

Robert M. Bastress, III

Attorney at DiPiero, Simmons, McGinley & Bastress

604 Virginia Street East

Charleston, WV 25301

Defendant Attorneys

Brian J. Laliberte

Attorney at Laliberte Saltman

421 West State Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Alana V. Tanoury

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Mark H. Lynch

Attorney at Covington & Burling - Washington

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Vincent I. Holzhall

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Erin Rhinehart

110 N. Main Street, Suite 1600

Dayton, OH 45402

Christopher Clayton Hollon

110 N. Main Suite, Suite 1600

Dayton, OH 45402

Donald Jeffrey Ireland

Attorney at Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing - Dayton

110 North Main Street

Dayton, OH 45402

Erin E. Rhinehart

Attorney at Faruki

110 North Main Street

Dayton, OH 45402

Christopher C. Hollon

Attorney at Faruki Ireland Cox Rhinehart & Dusing - Dayton

110 North Main Street

Dayton, OH 45402

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Order Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff Subdivisions' Claims Against Settling Distributor and Janssen Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/14/2022. (H,SN) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#27

(#27) Stipulated Dismissal Order as to McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation Pursuant to Settlement Agreement. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/7/21. (P,R) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #3

Summons Form

1 #2

Exhibit List of Defendants

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Order Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff Subdivisions' Claims Against Settling Distributor and Janssen Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/14/2022. (H,SN) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Stipulated Dismissal Order as to McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc. and AmerisourceBergen Corporation Pursuant to Settlement Agreement. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 10/7/21. (P,R) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Attorney Appearance by Sara E. Silva filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Silva, Sara) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Attorney Appearance by Safa W. Osmani filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Osmani, Safa) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Attorney Appearance by Maria R. Durant filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Durant, Maria) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) First Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical; Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.; Indivior, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Walgreen Co.; Kroger; CVS; WalMart; H.D. Smith; Hook-Superx, L.L.C.; K Mart Pharmacy; Meijer Pharmacy; Target Stores A Div. of Target Corp.. Filed by Butler County Board of Commissioners. (Troutman, Mark) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Attorney Appearance by Sean P. McGinley and Robert M. Bastress, III filed on behalf of Butler County Board of Commissioners. (P,R) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Defendant Johnson & Johnson served on 12/4/2017, answer due 12/26/2017. (kpt) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Actavis Pharma, Inc.; Actavis, LLC; Cephalon, Inc.; McKesson Corporation; Purdue Pharma, Inc.; and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Actavis Pharma, Inc.; Actavis, LLC; Cephalon, Inc.; McKesson Corporation; and Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 11/30/2017, Answers due 12/21/2017. Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 12/1/2017, Answer due 12/22/2017. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Rhinehart for Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Rhinehart, Erin) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER vacating the 12/13/2017 Status Conference. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 12/08/2017. (dh1) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Richard Karon for Plaintiff Butler County Board of Commissioners (Karon, Daniel) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed: Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 11/30/2017, answer due 12/21/2017; Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 12/1/2017, answer due 12/22/2017. (kpt) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662,2:17-cv-663,2:17-cv-664,2:17-cv-665,2:17-cv-680,2:17-cv-682,2:17-cv-696, 2:17-cv-704,2:17-cv-713,2:17-cv-723,2:17-cv-768,2:17-cv-769,2:17-cv-770,2:17-cv-883, 2:17-cv-886,2:17-cv-891,2:17-cv-894,2:17-cv-904,2:17-cv-918,2:17-cv-975,2:17-cv-1012 are related, the subject case nevertheless will remain with the Judge to who it was assigned. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on November 30, 2017. (jlk) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons were sent to the named defendants via certified mail. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Defendants Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., TEVA Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., and Watson Laboratories, Inc. (kpt) (kpt). [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6216489), filed by Butler County Board of Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit List of Defendants, #3 Summons Form) (Troutman, Mark) [Transferred from ohsd on 1/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant