This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2018 at 07:44:29 (UTC).

Burt v. Tennessee Department of Human Services

Case Summary

On 08/28/2018 Burt filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tennessee Department of Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan K Lee and Travis R McDonough. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00201

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan K Lee

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shameca Burt

Chattanooga, TN 37404

Defendant

Tennessee Department of Human Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Brian Allan Pierce

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (Nashville)

301 6Th Avenue N

Nashville, TN 37243

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shameca Burt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(aws, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#2

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/29/2018. (AML, ) Copy of Order mailed to Shameca Burt along with service packet to be completed and returned to Clerk's office for issuance and service. (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Shameca Burt. (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Shameca Burt. (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Shameca Burt. (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/29/2018. (AML, ) Copy of Order mailed to Shameca Burt along with service packet to be completed and returned to Clerk's office for issuance and service. (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Tennessee Department of Human Services. (aws, ) Serviced Summons, USM 285 form, Complaint, and Order to USMS. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Deposition by Shameca Burt. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#20

(#20) MOTION for CM/ECF Filing Privilege by Shameca Burt. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

19 #4

Exhibit D

19 #5

Exhibit E

19 #6

Exhibit F

19 #7

Exhibit G

19 #1

Exhibit A

19 #2

Exhibit B

19 #3

Exhibit C

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • Subpoenas to Testify Deposition Issued to Commissioner Danielle Barnes & Assistant Attorney General Brian A. Pierce, docketed per Plaintiff's request. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Deposition by Shameca Burt. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for CM/ECF Filing Privilege by Shameca Burt. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION against All Defendants., filed by Shameca Burt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(aws, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Shameca Burt. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Informational Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Brian Pierce re #16 Notice of Consent/Nonconsent. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Tennessee Department of Human Services (Pierce, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Tennessee Department of Human Services. (Pierce, Brian) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #13 Request for Entry of Default filed by Shameca Burt. (aws, ) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Request for Entry of Default by Shameca Burt. (aws, ). (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tennessee Department of Human Services. (Pierce, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Tennessee Department of Human Services. (Pierce, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shameca Burt. Tennessee Department of Human Services served on 9/17/2018. (aws, ) Mailed copy to Shameca Burt. (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Tennessee Department of Human Services. (aws, ) Serviced Summons, USM 285 form, Complaint, and Order to USMS. (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 8/29/2018. (AML, ) Copy of Order mailed to Shameca Burt along with service packet to be completed and returned to Clerk's office for issuance and service. (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Shameca Burt. (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Shameca Burt. (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Travis R McDonough on 8/28/18. (aws, ) Mailed to Shameca Burt. (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shameca Burt. (aws, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shameca Burt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(aws, ) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.