This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2019 at 07:43:34 (UTC).

Burdett v. United Parcel Service, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 Burdett filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against United Parcel Service, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Theresa L Springmann and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00418

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole M Burdett

Defendant

United Parcel Service, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lori W Jansen

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra S Oxyer

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Ind/IN

201 N Illinois St Ste 1900, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46204-4236

Amy S Wilson

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Ind/IN

201 N Illinois St Ste 1900, Po Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46204-4236

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jansen, Lori) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#9

(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 10:45 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#7

(#7) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. ; answer due by January 21, 2019. (Oxyer, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra S Oxyer on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Oxyer, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. of Declaration of Service to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy S Wilson on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3761329.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1810-CT-000626, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • (#13) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/22/2019 at 10:45 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • (#12) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: On the Court's own motion the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 is VACATED, to be reset by separate order. Text entry order. (lns) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jansen, Lori) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 10:45 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: United Parcel Service, Inc.; answer due by 1/21/2019. (lhc) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. ; answer due by January 21, 2019. (Oxyer, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (jss) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra S Oxyer on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Oxyer, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by United Parcel Service, Inc. of Declaration of Service to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy S Wilson on behalf of United Parcel Service, Inc. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3761329.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D03-1810-CT-000626, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less