This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 05:01:23 (UTC).

Bunnett & Company, Inc. et al v. J.D. Heiskell & Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/17/2017 Bunnett Company, Inc filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against J D Heiskell Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria-Elena James and Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-01475

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Maria-Elena James

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bunnett & Company, Inc

Energy Feeds International, LLC

Defendants

J.D. Heiskell & Company, Inc

Gareth Cheong

Frank Dores

Atwater, CA 95301

Jose Hernandez

Agrofin Inc.

Marcio Relva

Wei K. Yong-Su

Yap Wai Joon

Mary Dores

Gearheart Ag Consulting, Inc.

Mojo Yap

Wawasan Agrolipids SDN BHD

Palmolyn PTE LTD

Ray Gearheart

J.D. Heiskell Holdings, LLC

Todd Gearheart

Paros Corporation PTE LTD

E&K AG, LLC

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael K Molzberger

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 6600

Chicago, IL 60606

Jean-Paul P. Cart

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, Suite 1350

San Francisco, CA 94111

Steven Edward Swaney

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

One Market, Spear Street Tower, Suite 3100

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorneys

John Joseph Shaeffer

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

William Stephen Benesh

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 2300

Austin, TX 78701

Patrick Alexander Caballero

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

111 Congress Avenue, Suite 2300

Austin, TX 78701

Conrad Brently Wilton

Attorney at Fox Rothschild LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Daniel S. Connolly

Attorney at Bracewell LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 49Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

John Dennis O'Connor

Attorney at O'Connor & Associates

201 Mission Street, Suite 710

San Francisco, CA 94105

Edward W. Swanson

Attorney at Swanson & McNamara LLP

300 Montgomery St., Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Audrey A. Barron

Attorney at Swanson & McNamara LLP

300 Montgomery St., Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

August P. Gugelmann

Attorney at Swanson & McNamara LLP

300 Montgomery Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jacob Song

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

5 Park Plaza, Suite 1500

Irvine, CA 92614

Victoria H. Buter

Attorney at Kutak Rock, LLP

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Joshua S Weiner

Attorney at Kutak Rock, LLP

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Darci F. Madden

Attorney at Bryan Cave LLP

211 N. Broadway, Suite 3600

St. Louis, MO 63102

Jeffrey Fromberg

Attorney at Fromberg Edelstein Fromberg

2825 E. Tahquitz Canyon Way, Suite D-1

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Katherine E. Green

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Clyde DeWitt

Attorney at Law Offices of Clyde DeWitt, APC

410 South Rampart Boulevard, Suite 420

Las Vegas, NV 89145-5719

Kenneth Lee Marshall

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4070

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#126

#108

#104

#99

#88

#57

#143

#142

#139

#138

#137

#136

#134

#133

131 #1

Proposed Order

#131

130 #1

Exhibit A

161 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #142 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joshua S. Weiner. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2019) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#142) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Joshua S. Weiner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13428871.) filed by J.D. Heiskell Holdings, LLC. (Weiner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/12/2019) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Docket(#141) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Further Case Management Conference held telephonically on 5/23/2019. Discovery Stay Lifted.Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Prewitt, Michael Molzberger.Defendant Attorney: Vicki Buter, Darci Madden, Ed Swanson Pro Se: Frank Dores (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/23/2019) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docket(#140) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE The parties are to appear at a Case Management Conference tomorrow, May 23, 2019, at 11:00 AM. The parties shall appear telephonically at that time. Counsel shall coordinate with Frank Dores to telephone him directly at that time and then connect the parties via conference call to chambers at (415) 522-4120. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rslc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#139) CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Settlement Conference is rescheduled to 10/10/2019 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 4/24/2019 a copy of this notice was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#138) ORDER REFERRING DEFENDANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/23/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 5/8/2019 (cl, COURT STAFF).The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 5/8/19 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#137) NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The Settlement Conference is set for 7/12/2019 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 4/17/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#136) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/11/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2019) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Docket(#135) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard Seeborg: Further Case Management Conference held telephonically on 4/11/2019. Referral to Magistrate Judge for Settlement to follow.Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Not Reported or Recorded. Plaintiff Attorney: Matthew Prewitt, Michael Molzberger - TelephonicDefendant Attorney: Vicki Butler, Darci Madden, Ed Swanson, Frank Dores - Telephonic (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/11/2019) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bunnett & Company, Inc., Energy Feeds International, LLC.. (Cart, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 4/3/2017) (Entered: 04/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Clyde DeWitt (DeWitt, Clyde) (Filed on 3/30/2017) (Entered: 03/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Jose Hernandez, Mojo Yap. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017) (Entered: 03/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. (Cart, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 3/28/2017) (Entered: 03/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Agrofin Inc., Gareth Cheong, Mary Dores, E&K AG, LLC, John Franklin, Ray Gearheart, Todd Gearheart, Gearheart Ag Consulting, Inc., Jose Hernandez, J.D. Heiskell & Company, Inc., Palmolyn PTE LTD, Paros Corporation PTE LTD, Marcio Relva, Wawasan Agrolipids SDN BHD, Mojo Yap, Wei K. Yong-Su. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) (Entered: 03/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2017. Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017) (Entered: 03/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/3/2017. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017) (Entered: 03/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Bunnett & Company, Inc., Energy Feeds International, LLC (Cart, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 3/17/2017) (Entered: 03/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Cart, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 3/17/2017) (Entered: 03/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11243458.). Filed byBunnett & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cart, Jean-Paul) (Filed on 3/17/2017) (Entered: 03/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael K Molzberger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jean-Paul Phillip Cart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Edward Swaney