This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2018 at 08:11:43 (UTC).

Budd v. Gilbert, Town of

Case Summary

On 10/26/2018 Budd filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Gilbert, Town of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Deborah M Fine and Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03568

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Deborah M Fine

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Randy Budd

Defendant

Gilbert, Town of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony David Logan

Attorney at Venjuris PC

1938 E Osborn Rd.

Phoenix, AZ 85016

John Charles Mascari

Attorney at Venjuris PC

1938 E Osborn Rd.

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Randy Budd. (Logan, Anthony) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B

#12

(#12) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 25, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16128060 filed by Randy Budd. (Logan, Anthony) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

12 #1

Notice MIDP

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16128060. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-3568-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

12 #2

MIDP User Manual

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Gilbert, Town of. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Randy Budd. (Logan, Anthony) (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 25, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 11/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • (#11) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Dominic W. Lanza. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-3568-PHX-DWL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • (#10) Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Randy Budd. (Logan, Anthony) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Randy Budd. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Gilbert, Town of. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16128060. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-3568-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Randy Budd. (Logan, Anthony) (MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16128060 filed by Randy Budd. (Logan, Anthony) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MFR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less