This case was last updated from PACER on 04/17/2018 at 07:09:35 (UTC).

Buckeye International, Inc. v. Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Buckeye International, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00111

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Buckeye International, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Michael Patrick Crooks

Attorney at von Briesen & Roper, S.C.

10 East Doty Street, Suite 900

Madison, WI 53703

Maria D. Sanders

Attorney at Peterson, Johnson, & Murray

733 North Van Buren Street, 6Th Floor

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Stephen Clark

Attorney at RUNNYMEDE law group

7733 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ann Emmerich

Attorney at Bell, Moore & Richter, S.C.

345 West Washington Avenue, Suite 302

Madison, WI 53703-3007

Sheila M. Sullivan

Attorney at Bell, Moore & Richter, S.C.

345 West Washington Avenue, Suite 302

Madison, WI 53703-3007

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Buckeye International, Inc.. (Clark, Stephen) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#30

(#30) Notice of Appearance filed by Sheila M. Sullivan for Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. (Sullivan, Sheila) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#29

(#29) Motion to Strike #25 Affidavit, #24 Affidavit, #26 Proposed Findings of Fact, #28 Affidavit, #27 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact, by Plaintiff Buckeye International, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 4/19/2018. Brief in Reply due 4/26/2018. (Sanders, Maria) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#28

(#28) Affidavit of Tim Schmidt filed by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract - Buckeye and Schmidt) (Emmerich, Ann) Modified on 4/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#27

(#27) Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Emmerich, Ann) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

25 #12

Exhibit L - 5.18.17 Email from Werth

25 #11

Exhibit K - 3.24.17 email from Werth

25 #9

Exhibit I - 2.17.17 Email from Werth

24 #1

Exhibit A - Photo of Gym Floor

#24

(#24) Affidavit of Roy Reichow filed by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Photo of Gym Floor) (Emmerich, Ann) Modified on 4/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Buckeye International, Inc. (Sanders, Maria) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

#4

(#5) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Stephen Clark Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. (voc) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

2 #3

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Summons (Needs case number)

2 #1

Exhibit A - Documents

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2193762.), filed by Buckeye International, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents, #2 Summons (Needs case number), #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 02/19/2018)

#1

(#1) Disregard. See #2 . Modified on 2/19/2018. (lak) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

63 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Reply to Counterclaim by Plaintiff Buckeye International, Inc.. (Clark, Stephen) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Notice of Appearance filed by Sheila M. Sullivan for Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. (Sullivan, Sheila) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Motion to Strike #25 Affidavit, #24 Affidavit, #26 Proposed Findings of Fact, #28 Affidavit, #27 Response to Proposed Findings of Fact, by Plaintiff Buckeye International, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 4/19/2018. Brief in Reply due 4/26/2018. (Sanders, Maria) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Affidavit of Tim Schmidt filed by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Contract - Buckeye and Schmidt) (Emmerich, Ann) Modified on 4/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Response to Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Emmerich, Ann) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Proposed Findings of Fact filed by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Emmerich, Ann) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Affidavit of Jason Heiman filed by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Photo of Gym Floor, #2 Exhibit B - Buckeye's Procedures to Correct Floors, #3 Exhibit C - Werth Email to Heiman, #4 Exhibit D - 1.7.16 Email from Werth, #5 Exhibit E - Reformulation for 1500 Sq. Ft., #6 Exhibit F - Reformulation for 1800 Sq. Ft., #7 Exhibit G - Photos of Gym Floor, #8 Exhibit H - 5.10.16 Email from Werth, #9 Exhibit I - 2.17.17 Email from Werth, #10 Exhibit J - Google Spreadsheet, #11 Exhibit K - 3.24.17 Email from Werth, #12 Exhibit L - 5.18.17 Email from Werth, #13 Exhibit M - 5.26.17 Email from Werth, #14 Exhibit N - Email from Werth) (Emmerich, Ann) Modified on 4/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Affidavit of Roy Reichow filed by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Photo of Gym Floor) (Emmerich, Ann) Modified on 4/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Brief in Opposition by Defendant Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. re: #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Buckeye International, Inc. (Emmerich, Ann) (Entered: 04/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (voc) (Entered: 03/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2018
  • Second Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark at their earliest convenience. (voc) (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Buckeye International, Inc. (Sanders, Maria) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #4 Motion to Admit Stephen Clark Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 2/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion to Admit Stephen Clark Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2200095.) by Plaintiff Buckeye International, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Clark, Stephen) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Action Requested: Counsel for plaintiff shall prepare and file a #Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark at their earliest convenience. (voc) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc. (voc) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (voc) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (voc) (Entered: 02/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Schmidt Custom Floors, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2193762.), filed by Buckeye International, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Documents, #2 Summons (Needs case number), #3 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 02/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Disregard. See #2 . Modified on 2/19/2018. (lak) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less