This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2018 at 07:51:40 (UTC).

Buchhold v. Young

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Buchhold filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Young. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey L. Viken and Veronica L. Duffy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04116

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey L. Viken

Referral Judge

Veronica L. Duffy

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ralph Buchhold

Sioux Falls, SD 57117-5911

Respondents

Darin Young

Attorney General for the State of South Dakota

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) JUDGMENT in favor of Attorney General for the State of South Dakota, Darin Young and against Ralph Buchhold. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 11/6/18. (SB) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER adopting #12 Report and Recommendation an declining to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 11/6/18. (SB) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#12

(#12) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/19/2018. (CG) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#11

(#11) New Case LETTER with enclosed copy of the docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Ralph Buchhold. (JLS) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-04594. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/17/2018)

9 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#9

(#9) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 14, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

6 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/11/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ralph Buchhold.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

7 #2

Receipt

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Filing Fee: $5.00; Receipt No. 34611136440). Filed by Ralph Buchhold. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope, #(2) Receipt)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#4

(#4) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/6/2018. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE instructing Petitioner to file a petition within 28 days; Petition on Form due by 9/6/2018. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) JUDGMENT in favor of Attorney General for the State of South Dakota, Darin Young and against Ralph Buchhold. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 11/6/18. (SB) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER adopting #12 Report and Recommendation an declining to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Jeffrey L. Viken on 11/6/18. (SB) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/19/2018. (CG) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy added. (JLS) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) New Case LETTER with enclosed copy of the docket sheet sent by Clerk's Office to Ralph Buchhold. (JLS) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-04594. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • case electronically transmitted to the District of South Dakota. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 14, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/11/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ralph Buchhold.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PETITION for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, (Filing Fee: $5.00; Receipt No. 34611136440). Filed by Ralph Buchhold. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope, #(2) Receipt)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 9/6/2018. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK'S NOTICE instructing Petitioner to file a petition within 28 days; Petition on Form due by 9/6/2018. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Petition for Relief filed by Ralph Buchhold. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/17/2018.] (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less