This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2018 at 12:55:28 (UTC).

Bryant v. Neven et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2015 Bryant filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Neven. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cam Ferenbach and Andrew P. Gordon. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:15-CV-00486

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cam Ferenbach

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Christian Bryant

Respondents

Warden Dwight Neven

The Attorney General of the State of Nevada

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER that 7 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that, with respect to petitioner's unexhausted claims (Grounds I and III), petitioner shall have thirty (30) days to either: (1) inform this court in a sworn declara tion that he wishes to formally and forever abandon the unexhausted grounds for relief in his federal habeas petition and proceed on the exhausted grounds; OR (2) inform this court in a sworn declaration that he wishes to dismiss this petition withou t prejudice in order to return to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claims; OR (3) file a motion for a stay and abeyance, asking this court to hold his exhausted claims in abeyance while he returns to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claim s. If petitioner chooses to file a motion for a stay and abeyance, or seek other appropriate relief, respondents may respond to such motion as provided in Local Rule 7-2. FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to respond to this order within the time permitted, this case may be dismissed pursuant to Rose v. Lundy . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

#4

(#4) ORDER Denying as moot Petitioner's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the 1 -1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner's 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is Denied. Respondents s hall file a response to the petition within 90 days of service. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service to file a reply. The hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits shall be forward to the staff attorneys in Reno. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER that 7 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that, with respect to petitioner's unexhausted claims (Grounds I and III), petitioner shall have thirty (30) days to either: (1) inform this court in a sworn declara tion that he wishes to formally and forever abandon the unexhausted grounds for relief in his federal habeas petition and proceed on the exhausted grounds; OR (2) inform this court in a sworn declaration that he wishes to dismiss this petition withou t prejudice in order to return to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claims; OR (3) file a motion for a stay and abeyance, asking this court to hold his exhausted claims in abeyance while he returns to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claim s. If petitioner chooses to file a motion for a stay and abeyance, or seek other appropriate relief, respondents may respond to such motion as provided in Local Rule 7-2. FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to respond to this order within the time permitted, this case may be dismissed pursuant to Rose v. Lundy . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Denying as moot Petitioner's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the 1 -1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Petitioner's 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is Denied. Respondents s hall file a response to the petition within 90 days of service. Petitioner shall have 30 days from service to file a reply. The hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits shall be forward to the staff attorneys in Reno. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.