This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2019 at 07:56:14 (UTC).

BRYANT v. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 BRYANT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Tanya Walton Pratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03660

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVID BRYANT

Defendants

BIG TEN CONFERENCE

NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION

THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent P. Circelli

Attorney at CIRCELLI WALTER & YOUNG PLLC

500 East 4Th St., Suite 250

Fort Worth, TX 76102

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC. (NAD) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by DAVID BRYANT. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 1/8/2019. (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC.. (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting Vincent P. Circelli's #3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of DAVID BRYANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/3/2018. (SWM) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent P. Circelli to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5173298), filed by Plaintiff DAVID BRYANT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BIG TEN CONFERENCE, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by DAVID BRYANT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5167685) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by DAVID BRYANT. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 1/8/2019. (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC. (NAD) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC.. (Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting Vincent P. Circelli's #3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of DAVID BRYANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 12/3/2018. (SWM) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent P. Circelli to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5173298), filed by Plaintiff DAVID BRYANT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BIG TEN CONFERENCE, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by DAVID BRYANT. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5167685) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Circelli, Vincent) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.