This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 16:05:14 (UTC).

Bryant v. Micron Technology, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2018 Bryant filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Micron Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04599

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stuart Bryant

Defendants

Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc.

Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc.

Micron Technology, Inc.

Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.

SK Hynix, Inc.

SK Hynix America, Inc.

Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aaron M. Sheanin

Attorney at Robins Kaplan

2440 W El Camino Real, Suite 100

Mountain View, CA 94040

Tai Snow Milder

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorneys

Ian T Simmons

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-4001

Stephen Joel McIntyre

Attorney at OMelveny and Myers LLP

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

Brian Patrick Quinn

Attorney at O'Melveny and Myers LLP

1625 Eye Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Brian Yanlang Chang

Attorney at Eimer Stahl LLP

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#31

#29

#26

#25

#24

9 #2

Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Aaron M. Sheanin

#9

#75

#71

#69

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2019
  • CASE IS CONSOLIDATED. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE IN 18-CV-3805-JSW. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) ORDER REGARDING APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD COUNSEL FOR DIRECT PURCHASER PLANTIFFS. ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/4/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2019) Modified on 9/5/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to (57 in 4:18-cv-02518-JSW) MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g), (55 in 4:18-cv-02518-JSW) Motion to Appoint Cotchett, Pitre & McCarthy, LLP and Saveri & Saveri, Inc. Co-Lead Class Counsel for Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/3/2018. Replies due by 1/7/2019. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO APPOINT LEAD COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/18/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) Supplemental Joint Statement by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Stuart Bryant, Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology Inc., SK Hynix America, Inc., SK Hynix, Inc. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/17/2018) Modified on 9/18/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER REGARDING OMNIBUS STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/10/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) INCORRECT ORDER ATTACHED - PLEASE SEE DOC. NO 28ORDER REGARDING OMNIBUS STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/10/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/11/2018 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/11/2018 (jjoS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) Joint Statement Pursuant to Order Regarding Omnibus Status Conference by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Stuart Bryant, Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc., Micron Semiconductor Products, Inc., Micron Technology, Inc., SK Hynix America, Inc., SK Hynix, Inc. (Simmons, Ian) (Filed on 9/7/2018) Modified on 9/10/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by SK Hynix America, Inc., SK Hynix, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate SK Telecom Co., Ltd. for SK Hynix, Inc. (Chang, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2018) Modified on 8/24/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Yanlang Chang (Chang, Brian) (Filed on 8/23/2018) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/25/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - RE-FILED IN LOWER CASE NUMBER ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related filed by Stuart Bryant. Responses due by 8/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. Sheanin in Support of Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Aaron M. Sheanin, #3 Proposed Order)(Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 7/31/2018) Modified on 7/31/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • (#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/14/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2018) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Proposed Summons. (Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Proposed Summons. (Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons. (Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Proposed Summons. (Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12553783.). Filed byStuart Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheanin, Aaron) (Filed on 7/30/2018) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MICRON CONSUMER PRODUCTS GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON SEMICONDUCTOR PRODUCTS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MICRON TECHNOLOGY, INC. is a litigant