Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/25/2018 at 07:37:37 (UTC).

Brunelle v. Hanover Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 09/26/2018 Brunelle filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hanover Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alvin W. Thompson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01614

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alvin W. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Brunelle

Defendant

Hanover Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Magdalena B. Wiktor

Attorney at Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC-NL

105 Huntington St., Po Box 1631

New London, CT 06320

Defendant Attorneys

Beverly W. Garofalo

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, CT

90 State House Sq., 8Th Fl.

Hartford, CT 06103-3708

Sarah C. Baskin

Attorney at Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, CT

90 State House Sq., 8Th Fl.

Hartford, CT 06103-3708

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Hanover Insurance Company.(Garofalo, Beverly) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C. Baskin on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company (Baskin, Sarah) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#11

(#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 22, 2018 To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by Hanover Insurance Company. (Garofalo, Beverly) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly W. Garofalo on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company (Garofalo, Beverly) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/11/18. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Brunelle. Hanover Insurance Company served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Wiktor, Magdalena) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hanover Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Magdalena B. Wiktor* *Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC-NL* *105 Huntington St., PO Box 1631* *New London, CT 06320*. (Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Lisa Brunelle, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

5 #1

Discovery Attachment

#5

(#5) NOTICE RE INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2018. (Attachment: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/26/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/26/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2018 Discovery due by 3/28/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2019 Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hanover Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4984810.), filed by Lisa Brunelle.(Wiktor, Magdalena) Modified on 9/26/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Hanover Insurance Company.(Garofalo, Beverly) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Answer deadline updated for Hanover Insurance Company to 11/22/2018 nunc pro tunc. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Defendant's First Motion, on Consent, for Enlargement of Time in Which to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #11 ) is hereby GRANTED nunc pro tunc, up to and including 11/22/18. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/14/18. (Patel, R.) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah C. Baskin on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company (Baskin, Sarah) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 22, 2018 To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 Complaint by Hanover Insurance Company. (Garofalo, Beverly) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Beverly W. Garofalo on behalf of Hanover Insurance Company (Garofalo, Beverly) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/11/18. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Brunelle. Hanover Insurance Company served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Wiktor, Magdalena) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hanover Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Magdalena B. Wiktor* *Madsen, Prestley & Parenteau, LLC-NL* *105 Huntington St., PO Box 1631* *New London, CT 06320*. (Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Notice, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Lisa Brunelle, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE RE INITIAL DISCOVERY PROTOCOLS Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2018. (Attachment: #1 Discovery Attachment)(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/26/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/26/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2018 Discovery due by 3/28/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2019 Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2018.(Enderlin, M.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hanover Insurance Company. (Wiktor, Magdalena) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Hanover Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-4984810.), filed by Lisa Brunelle.(Wiktor, Magdalena) Modified on 9/26/2018 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY THE(ERRONEOUSLY is a litigant